MAC is the national organization of the metals and minerals industry. Its Members are engaged in mineral exploration, extraction, beneficiation, smelting, refining and other processing of metallic and non-metallic minerals. MAC represents the interests of its members at the national and international levels and liaises with other mining industry associations, foreign, national, provincial and territorial. MAC responds to enquiries from the public, media and government and provides a vehicle for joint and voluntary action by its member firms. The Association advises government institiutions and public office holders regarding the impact of policies, legislation and regulations on the Canadian metals and minerals industry.
PIERRE GRATTON, President & Chief Executive Officer
Address:
1105 - 350 Sparks Street
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-233-9392
Ext.
318
Fax number:
613-233-8897
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The Mining Association of Canada (MAC)/L'association minière du Canada (AMC) | 2024-04-04 | current |
The Mining Association of Canada (MAC)/L'association minière du Canada (AMC) | 2008-08-12 | 2024-04-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
PIERRE GRATTON | 2011-06-01 | Current |
Gordon Peeling | 1998-01-28 | 2011-06-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Mineral Resources
Indian & Northern Affairs Canada, Northern Affairs Program |
1998 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager/Chief of Mineral Sector and a second position as Advisor, Advanced Materials in Policy Sector
Industry Canada, Mineral Sector and the Advanced Materials in Policy Sector |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Director of Technology Transfer
Energy, Mines and Resources, Canada Center for Mineral and Energy Technology (CANMET) |
1984 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Consumer & Corporate Affairs, Minister's Office |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
Minister of State for Mines, Minister's Office |
1980 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Head, Community Development
National Museum of Science and Technology, Marketing |
1993 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advertising and Promotions Officer
National Museum of Science and Technology, Marketing |
1992 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Management Practices
National Museum of Science and Technology, Personnel |
1988 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Corporate Secretary
National Museum of Science and Technology, Director's Office |
1988 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director, Personnel
National Museum of Science and Technology, Personnel |
1987 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Personnel Generalist
National Museums of Canada, Personal Services |
1983 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Human Resources
National Museums of Canada, Personnel Services |
1981 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Staffing Officer
Finance Canada, Personnel |
1980 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Organization and Methods Analyst
Finance Canada, Management Practices |
1979 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Organization and Methods Analyst
Labour Canada, Management Improvement |
1975 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Projects Assistant
Labour Canada, Management Improvement |
1972 to 1975 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Mineral Resources
Indian & Northern Affairs Canada, Northern Affairs Program |
1998 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General and Minister of Justice |
June 1997 to June 1999 | Not a designated office |
Press Secretary
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's office |
June 1996 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |