Total Number of Communication Reports: 354
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Canada Business Corporations Act "CBCA" corporation which acts as volume purchasing group for independent cable television companies across Canada. Company also acts as regulatory representative for those cable television companies.
JAY THOMSON, President & C.E.O.
Address:
447 Gondola Point Road
Quispamsis, NB E2E 1E1
Canada
Telephone number:
506-849-1334
Ext.
203
Fax number:
506-849-1338
Canadian Cable Systems Alliance Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Canadian Cable Systems Alliance Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Cable Systems Alliance Inc. | 2008-06-30 | 2024-03-16 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
JAY THOMSON | 2017-02-01 | 2024-03-16 |
Jenny Bosien | 2016-10-19 | 2017-02-01 |
Alyson Townsend | 2006-06-27 | 2016-10-19 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislation Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Sean Murphy, M.P. |
August 2009 to November 2009 | Not a designated office |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Indian Affairs and Northern Development, Minister's Office |
June 2004 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislation Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Sean Murphy, M.P. |
August 2009 to November 2009 | Not a designated office |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Indian Affairs and Northern Development, Minister's Office |
June 2004 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |