AstraZeneca is the largest research-based pharmaceutical company in Canada and one of the largest pharmaceutical companies in the world. Defined by the belief that "Health Connects Us All," AstraZeneca is a company that is focused on making a meaningful difference to patients' lives through collaborations. In Canada, we invest approximately $100 million annually in research and development and charitable donations. The company employs approximately 850 people across Canada who strive to make the most meaningful difference to patient health through the discovery, development and marketing of our great medicines. Most of our Canadian employees work at our high-tech headquarters in Mississauga, Ontario, while 125 highly-skilled scientists work at our world-class basic pain research centre in Montréal, Québec. AstraZeneca Research & Development Montréal (AZRDM) is a leader in pain control research, and scientists at the facility are focused on finding new and innovative therapeutic solutions to treat acute and chronic pain. Our innovative and extensive product portfolio focuses on six key areas of medicine: gastrointestinal, cardiovascular, neuroscience, respiratory and inflammation, oncology and infectious disease.
Elaine Campbell, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
1004 Middlegate Road
Mississauga, ON L4Y 1M4
Canada
Telephone number:
905-615-6883
AstraZeneca Canada Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
AstraZeneca Canada Inc. | 2024-04-30 | current |
AstraZeneca Canada Inc. | 2008-07-31 | 2024-04-30 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Gaby Bourbara | 2024-03-01 | Current |
Kiersten Combs | 2021-09-01 | 2024-03-01 |
Jane Chung | 2019-11-01 | 2021-09-01 |
Daniel Smedley | 2019-08-01 | 2019-11-01 |
Jamie Freedman | 2017-11-28 | 2019-08-01 |
Ed Dybka | 2015-01-02 | 2017-11-28 |
Elaine Campbell | 2012-01-09 | 2015-01-02 |
Marion McCourt | 2010-04-12 | 2012-01-09 |
Mark Jones | 2007-03-08 | 2010-04-12 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant and Special Assistant for Parliamentary Affairs & Communications
House of Commons, Belinda Stronach, M.P. |
2004 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Grant McNally, M.P. |
1999 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Researcher
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Preston Manning, M.P. |
1997 to 1999 | Not a designated office |