The Canadian Agri-Food Trade Alliance is an independent, industry funded organization, made up of a broad cross section of Canada's agri-food sector. CAFTA's mission is to advocate the liberalization of global agri-food markets and support a more open and fair international trading environment for agri-food.
Michael Harvey, EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR
Address:
350 Sparks Street
Suite 1101
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-850-0891
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Agri-Food Trade Alliance/Alliance Canadienne du Commerce Agroalimentaire | 2024-05-07 | current |
Canadian Agri-Food Trade Alliance/Alliance Canadienne du Commerce Agroalimentaire | 2014-07-01 | 2024-05-07 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Harvey | 2023-07-24 | Current |
Claire Citeau | 2014-07-01 | 2023-05-16 |
KEITH LANCASTLE | 2007-06-19 | 2008-05-30 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyst
Privy Council Office, Foreign and Defence Policy Secretariat |
September 2011 to May 2012 | Not a designated office |
Foreign Service Officer
Global Affairs Canada, Global Affairs Canada |
July 1996 to September 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyst
Privy Council Office, Foreign and Defence Policy Secretariat |
September 2011 to May 2012 | Not a designated office |
Foreign Service Officer
Global Affairs Canada, Global Affairs Canada |
July 1996 to September 2011 | Not a designated office |