Total Number of Communication Reports: 75
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Founded in 1848, the University of Ottawa is a bilingual institution and one of Canada's major research-intensive universities. The University has over 34,000 students from all parts of Canada and more than 150 countries enrolled, studying in over 300 programs across 10 faculties. The University of Ottawa is characterized by its unique history, its commitment to bilingualism and its location in the heart of the national capital and at the juncture of French and English Canada.
Allan Rock, President and Vice-Chancellor
End date of the last completed financial year: 2009-04-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Research Chair | $7,942,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Foundation for Innovation | $5,174,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $39,813,000.00 | Yes |
Health Canada (HC) | $135,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $20,912,000.00 | Yes |
Other Federal | $28,749,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $8,638,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
550 rue Cumberland
Ottawa, ON K1N 6N5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-562-5809
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
University of Ottawa/Université d'Ottawa | 2024-04-29 | current |
University of Ottawa/Université d'Ottawa | 2008-07-15 | 2024-04-29 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jacques Frémont | 2016-07-01 | Current |
Allan Rock | 2008-07-15 | 2016-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada - Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1983 to August 1983 | Not a designated office |
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada -Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1982 to August 1982 | Not a designated office |
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada -Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1981 to September 1981 | Not a designated office |
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada -Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1980 to August 1980 | Not a designated office |
Geologicial Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada -Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1977 to August 1977 | Not a designated office |
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada - Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1976 to August 1976 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member of the Governing Council
Medical Research Council of Canada, Governing Council |
June 1996 to November 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyste principal
Justice Canada, politiques pénales |
September 2003 to June 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Department of Indian Affairs and Northern Development, Office of the Minister |
December 1993 to January 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Deputy Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, CMC |
March 2007 to March 2008 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Minister of State (Sport), Office of the Minister |
July 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Office of the Minister of Western Economic Diversification, Chief of Staff |
July 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
Public Works and Government Services, Office of the Minister |
January 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Office of the Minister |
May 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Press Secretary
National Defence Canada, Office of the Minister |
April 2000 to April 2001 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Honourable Maria Minna, MP |
January 1997 to October 1997 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Beryl Gaffney, MP |
March 1996 to December 1996 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
Veteran Affairs Canada, Vimy Ridge Monument |
September 1993 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
House of Commons, Library of Parliament |
September 1992 to April 1993 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
National Capital Commission, MacKenzie King Estate |
May 1992 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
House of Commons, Library of Parliament |
October 1990 to April 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Directeur exécutif
MINISTÈRE DU PATRIMOINE CANADIEN, Affaires du portefeuille |
June 2004 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Directeur général
MINISTÈRE DU PATRIMOINE CANADIEN, Programmes d’appui aux langues officielles |
September 1994 to May 2004 | Not a designated office |
Directeur général
MINISTÈRE DU PATRIMOINE CANADIEN, Bureau des relations fédérales-provinciales |
September 1993 to August 1994 | Not a designated office |
Directeur général
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation – Langues officielles en éducation |
September 1992 to August 1993 | Not a designated office |
Conseiller spécial – Conseil de l’Europe
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation |
September 1990 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Directeur général
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation – Langues officielles en éducation |
September 1987 to August 1990 | Not a designated office |
Directeur - Développement de politiques, analyse et recherches
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation – Langues officielles en éducation |
September 1984 to August 1987 | Not a designated office |
Directeur - Opérations et coordination régionale
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation – Langues officielles en éducation |
January 1982 to August 1984 | Not a designated office |
Coordonnateur national
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Langues officielles - Développement des minorités linguistiques |
September 1979 to December 1981 | Not a designated office |
Agent de développement communautaire
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Langues officielles - Développement des minorités linguistiques |
July 1974 to August 1979 | Not a designated office |
Professeur de français langue seconde
COMMISSION DE LA FONCTION PUBLIQUE, École de langues |
September 1971 to June 1974 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Appointments
Privy Council Office, Office of the Prime Minister |
November 1993 to December 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Minister responsible for Infrastructure
Infrastructure Canada, Office of the Minister |
August 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Industry
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Western Economic Diversification
Western Economic Diversification Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister for the Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency, Office of the Minister |
January 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Health
Health Canada, Office of the Minister |
June 1997 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Justice and Attorney General of Canada
Justice Canada, Office of the Minister |
November 1993 to June 2007 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
Parliament, House of Commons |
November 1993 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
May 1971 to August 1971 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
May 1970 to August 1970 | Not a designated office |