End date of the last completed financial year: 2019-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $243,459.00 | Yes |
FACTOR | $84,337.00 | Yes |
Address:
56 Wellesley St. West, Suite 320
Toronto, ON M5S 2S3
Canada
Telephone number:
416-926-1966
Web address:
http://www.musicpublisher.ca/
Margaret McGuffin, Executive Director
Canadian Music Publishers Association (operating as Music Publishers Canada) / Association canadienne des editeurs de musique (operating as Editeurs de Musique au Canada) is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Canadian Music Publishers Association (operating as Music Publishers Canada) / Association canadienne des editeurs de musique (operating as Editeurs de Musique au Canada) is not a coalition.
The activities of Canadian Music Publishers Association (operating as Music Publishers Canada) / Association canadienne des editeurs de musique (operating as Editeurs de Musique au Canada) are not controlled or directed by another individual, organization or corporation with a direct interest in the outcome of this undertaking.
Canadian Music Publishers Association (operating as Music Publishers Canada) / Association canadienne des editeurs de musique (operating as Editeurs de Musique au Canada) does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
Jacqueline LaRocque | Public offices held
Firm: Compass Rose Group
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Music Publishers Association (operating as Music Publishers Canada)/Association canadienne des editeurs de musique (operating as Editeurs de Musique au Canada) | 2024-04-01 | current |
Canadian Music Publishers Association (operating as Music Publishers Canada)/Association canadienne des editeurs de musique (operating as Editeurs de Musique au Canada) | 2020-02-18 | 2024-04-01 |
Canadian Music Publishers Association/ | 2017-01-06 | 2020-02-18 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
DIRECTOR OF COMMUNICATIONS AND CHIEF SPOKESPERSON TO THE MINISTER OF INTERNATIONAL TRADE
International Trade, Government of Canada |
December 2003 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
SENIOR ADVISOR TO THE DEPUTY MINISTER
Human Resources Development Canada, Government of Canada |
December 1999 to June 2002 | Not a designated office |
SPECIAL ASSISTANT TO THE DEPUTY MINISTER
Human Resources Development Canada, Government of Canada |
November 1998 to December 1999 | Not a designated office |
CHIEF, PUBLIC AFFAIRS MINISTERIAL SERVICES
Human Resources Development Canada, Government of Canada |
September 1997 to November 1998 | Not a designated office |
CHIEF, STRATEGIC POLICY BRANCH
Human Resources Development Canada, Government of Canada |
October 1994 to September 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
DIRECTOR OF COMMUNICATIONS AND CHIEF SPOKESPERSON TO THE MINISTER OF INTERNATIONAL TRADE
International Trade, Government of Canada |
December 2003 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
SENIOR ADVISOR TO THE DEPUTY MINISTER
Human Resources Development Canada, Government of Canada |
December 1999 to June 2002 | Not a designated office |
SPECIAL ASSISTANT TO THE DEPUTY MINISTER
Human Resources Development Canada, Government of Canada |
November 1998 to December 1999 | Not a designated office |
CHIEF, PUBLIC AFFAIRS MINISTERIAL SERVICES
Human Resources Development Canada, Government of Canada |
September 1997 to November 1998 | Not a designated office |
CHIEF, STRATEGIC POLICY BRANCH
Human Resources Development Canada, Government of Canada |
October 1994 to September 1997 | Not a designated office |