Total Number of Communication Reports: 219
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Canopy Growth is a world-leading diversified cannabis company, offering distinct brands and curated cannabis varieties in dried, oil and capsule forms. Through its wholly‑owned subsidiaries, Canopy Growth operates numerous state-of-the-art production facilities with over half a million square feet of GMP-certified indoor and greenhouse production capacity, all to an unparalleled level of quality assurance procedures and testing. Canopy Growth has established partnerships with leading sector names in Canada and abroad, with interests and operations spanning four continents. The Company is proudly dedicated to educating healthcare practitioners, providing consistent access to high quality cannabis products, conducting robust clinical research, and furthering the public's understanding of cannabis.
Bruce Linton, CEO and Chair
Address:
One Hershey Drive
Smiths Falls, ON k7a 0a8
Canada
Telephone number:
416-930-6839
Canopy Growth Corporation is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canopy Growth Corporation/ | 2024-05-10 | current |
Canopy Growth Corporation/ | 2017-08-01 | 2024-05-10 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
David Klein | 2020-01-14 | Current |
Mark Zekulin | 2019-07-03 | 2020-01-14 |
Bruce Linton | 2017-08-01 | 2019-07-03 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Department of Fisheries and Oceans, Minister's Office |
April 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Manager
House of Commons, Thornhill MP |
October 2001 to March 2002 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Kitchener Centre MP |
July 2000 to September 2001 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Mississauga West MP |
September 1999 to July 2000 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Oak Ridges Constituency Office |
May 1999 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Oak Ridges Constituency Office |
May 1998 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Oak Ridges Constituency Office |
May 1997 to September 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Etobicoke Centre |
1986 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Department of Fisheries and Oceans, Minister's Office |
April 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Manager
House of Commons, Thornhill MP |
October 2001 to March 2002 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Kitchener Centre MP |
July 2000 to September 2001 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Mississauga West MP |
September 1999 to July 2000 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Oak Ridges Constituency Office |
May 1999 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Oak Ridges Constituency Office |
May 1998 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Oak Ridges Constituency Office |
May 1997 to September 1997 | Not a designated office |