Hog production Poultry production Manufacture of meat products
Michael McCain, President & Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2017-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $5,304,800.00 | Yes |
Address:
6897 Financial Drive
MISSISSAUGA, ON L5N 0A8
Canada
Telephone number:
905-285-5743
Maple Leaf Foods Inc. / Les Aliments Maple Leaf is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Maple Leaf Foods Inc. / Les Aliments Maple Leaf does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Maple Leaf Foods Inc./Les Aliments Maple Leaf | 2024-04-10 | current |
Maple Leaf Foods Inc./Les Aliments Maple Leaf | 2008-07-01 | 2024-04-10 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Curtis Frank | 2023-05-11 | Current |
Michael McCain | 2005-08-17 | 2023-05-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Veterinarian
CFIA, Saskatchewan |
July 2001 to March 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, International Trade Policy Directorate |
2001 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Director
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Grains and Oilseeds Division |
1998 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director
National Farm Products Council, Executive |
1998 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commissioner
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Trade Commissioner Service |
1982 to 1997 | Not a designated office |