Objets | Détails | Catégories |
---|---|---|
Institutions financières, Propriété intellectuelle, Sécurité nationale/sécurité, Vie privée et Accès à l'information, Sciences et technologies
|
Cyber security - Engage with public office holders on how to ensure the safety and integrity of Canada’s insurance industry’s data and technology systems.
|
Politique ou Programme
|
Questions constitutionnelles, Relations fédérales-provinciales, Santé, Industrie
|
Health care - Seeking to raise awareness about prescription drug coverage policy considerations and concerns in context of national universal pharmacare proposals as an association and as a participant in the Together for Better Health organization. Other related initiatives include high cost drugs for rare disease and Patented Medicine Prices Review Board regulations. Other health care policy considerations include encouraging digital health innovation and the pan-Canadian Pharmaceutical Alliance.
|
Politique ou Programme
|
Institutions financières, Industrie
|
Insurance Companies Act, with respect to annual reporting
|
Proposition législative, Projet de loi ou résolution
|
Institutions financières, Santé
|
Insurance regulation - Engage with public office holders regarding Canada’s financial services and healthcare sectors, including insurance sector regulation.
|
Règlement
|
Climat, Institutions financières, Marchés publics, Logement, Infrastructure, Développement international, Recherche et développement
|
International development - Engage with public officer holders with respect to partnership opportunities regarding sustainable investments that support international development.
|
Politique ou Programme, Subvention, Contribution ou autre avantage financier
|
Sécurité nationale/sécurité, Vie privée et Accès à l'information
|
National data strategy - Engage with public office holders regarding the health and financial data held by Canada’s insurance and financial services industries.
|
Politique ou Programme
|
Institutions financières, Impôts et finances
|
Open banking - Discuss with public office holders the potential relevance of open banking for Canada’s insurance industry.
|
Politique ou Programme
|
Budget, Questions touchant les consommateurs, Industrie, Pensions, Impôts et finances
|
Pensions - Engage with public office holders regarding enhancing retirement security for Canadians through retirement planning, public and registered savings and pension plans, and annuities.
|
Politique ou Programme
|
Développement économique, Emploi et formation, Affaires étrangères, Relations internationales, Commerce international
|
Trade - Engage with public office holders on how to best maximize the benefits of Canada’s trade relations for Canada’s insurance industry and the broader economy.
|
Politique ou Programme
|
Sun Life is a leading international financial services organization providing insurance, wealth and asset management solutions to individual and corporate Clients. Sun Life has operations in a number of markets worldwide, including Canada, the United States, the United Kingdom, Ireland, Hong Kong, the Philippines, Japan, Indonesia, India, China, Australia, Singapore, Vietnam, Malaysia and Bermuda. As of December 31, 2019, Sun Life had total assets under management of $1,099 billion.
Kevin Strain, President & Chief Executive Officer
Adresse :
1 York Street
Toronto, ON M5J 0B6
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
416-979-9966
Financière Sun Life / Sun Life Financial Inc. n'est pas une filiale d'une société mère.
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Sun Life Financial Inc./Financière Sun Life | 2024-05-14 | actuel |
Sun Life Financial Inc./Financière Sun Life | 2008-08-13 | 2024-05-14 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Kevin Strain | 2021-08-06 | Actuel |
Dean Connor | 2011-12-01 | 2021-08-06 |
Donald Stewart | 2005-08-11 | 2011-12-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, MP Dianne Watts Office |
novembre 2015 à septembre 2017 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director, Public Affairs
Export Development Canada, Corporate Affairs |
mai 2013 à décembre 2017 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, MP Dianne Watts Office |
novembre 2015 à septembre 2017 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Finance Canada, Minister's Office |
janvier 2007 à octobre 2009 | octobre 3, 2009 |