TC Energy and its affiliates deliver the energy millions of people rely on every day to power their lives and fuel industry. Focused on what we do and how we do it, we are guided by core values of safety, responsibility, collaboration and integrity. Our more than 7,000 people are committed to sustainably developing and operating pipeline, power generation and energy storage facilities across Canada, the U.S. and Mexico. TC Energy’s common shares trade on the Toronto (TSX) and New York (NYSE) stock exchanges under the symbol TRP. Visit TCEnergy.com and connect with us on social media to learn more.
Francois Poirier, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2019-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Emmissions Reduction Alberta (ERA) | $0.00 | Yes |
Address:
450 - 1st Street, SW
Calgary, AB T2P 5H1
Canada
Telephone number:
403-920-2000
Fax number:
403-920-2467
TC Energy Corporation / Corporation TC Énergie is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
TransCanada PipeLines Limited/ | 2024-05-09 | current |
TransCanada PipeLines Limited/ | 2023-05-03 | 2024-05-09 |
TC Energy Corporation/Corporation TC Énergie | 2019-05-03 | 2023-05-03 |
TransCanada Corporation | 2008-07-02 | 2019-05-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Francois Poirier | 2021-01-01 | Current |
Russell Girling | 2010-07-01 | 2021-01-01 |
Harold Kvisle | 2005-10-24 | 2010-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Department of Finance
Federal Government, Minister's Office |
1997 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Contractor
Natural Resources Canada, Ottawa |
March 2009 to December 2009 | Not a designated office |
Contractor
Department of Finance, Ottawa |
December 2008 to February 2009 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student/Tour Guide
Canadian Museum of Civilization, Ottawa |
May 1987 to April 1988 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student/Tour Guide
Senate of Canada, Ottawa |
May 1984 to December 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Co-op Student
National Energy Board, Calgary |
January 1994 to September 1994 | Not a designated office |
Co-op Student
National Energy Board, Calgary |
May 1993 to September 1993 | Not a designated office |
Co-op Student
Forestry Canada, Sault Ste. Marie |
January 1992 to April 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Department of Finance
Federal Government, Minister's Office |
1997 to 2001 | Not a designated office |