Distributor of light-duty vehicles, parts and accessories.
Larry Hutchinson, President and CEO
Address:
One Toyota Place
Toronto, ON M1H 1H9
Canada
Telephone number:
416-438-6320
Fax number:
416-431-8373
Toyota Canada Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Toyota Canada Inc. | 2024-04-01 | current |
Toyota Canada Inc. | 2008-07-02 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Larry Hutchinson | 2016-01-01 | Current |
Seiji Ichii | 2012-01-02 | 2016-01-01 |
Yoichi Tomihara | 2007-03-27 | 2012-01-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Support staff for Member of Cabinet, Office of the Attorney general of canada |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Support staff for Member of Cabinet, Office of the President of the Queen's Privy Council |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Head, House Business
Support staff Member of Cabinet, Office of the President of the Queen's Privy Council |
1984 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Support staff for Member of Parliament, Office of the Opposition house leader |
1982 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
Support staff for member of Parliament, Office of the Member of Parliament for Grey Bruce |
1979 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Support staff for Member of Parliament, Office of the Leader of the Progressive Conservative Party |
1999 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Communications advisor
Support staff for member of the Cabinet, Office of the Secretary of State for External Affairs |
1993 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Communications advisor
Support staff for Cabinet member, Office of the Minister responsible for Constitutional Affairs and President of t |
1991 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Director Media Centre
Specific group formed for a specific government event, Government staff responsible for President Gorbachev visit to Canada |
1990 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Support staff for Head of State, Office of the Governor General |
1990 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Communications advisor
Specific group mandated by Parliament, Open Skies Conference |
1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Communications advisor
Member of the Cabinet support staff, Office of the Minister of Justice |
1988 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Communications advisor
Free Trade Negotiations Office, Specific Office formed by Parliamentary mandate |
1987 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Communications advisor
Task Force on Broadcasting, Task Force formed by Parliamentary mandate |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Communications Advisor
Office of the Canadian Emergency Co-ordinator African Famine, Special purpose unit formed by Parliamentary mandate |
1984 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Press secretary and assistant chief of Staff,
Member of Parliament Political Support Staff, Office of the Leader of the Opposition and later the Prime Minister's Office |
1976 to 1981 | Not a designated office |