ENMAX Corporation (ENMAX) is a vertically integrated company that provides electricity, natural gas, renewable energy and value added services to its customers. ENMAX core operations include the provision of infrastructure and infrastructure services including transmission and distribution services and regulated rate options to customers, the generation of electricity and the delivery of a variety of electricity, natural gas and renewable energy products to residential and commercial customers in Alberta.
Gianna Manes, President and CEO
Address:
141 - 50th Avenue SE
Calgary, AB T2G 4S7
Canada
Telephone number:
403-514-1477
Fax number:
403-514-2940
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
ENMAX Corporation | 2024-04-03 | current |
ENMAX Corporation | 2008-07-01 | 2024-04-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Mark Poweska | 2022-09-26 | Current |
Charles Ruigrok | 2021-10-18 | 2022-09-26 |
Wayne O'Connor | 2020-06-22 | 2021-10-18 |
Gianna Manes | 2012-04-01 | 2020-06-22 |
Charles Ruigrok | 2011-02-07 | 2012-04-01 |
Gary Holden | 2008-03-05 | 2011-02-07 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Western Economic Diversification, Ministers office |
July 1993 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor
Ministry of Industry, Science, Technology Canada and International Trade, Ministers office |
March 1993 to July 1993 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to Minister of Industry, Science Technology Canada and International Trade
Ministry of Industry, Science, Technology Canada and International Trade, Ministers office |
September 1991 to September 1992 | Not a designated office |