THE AEROSPACE INDUSTRIES ASSOCIATION OF CANADA (AIAC) IS AN INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION REPRESENTING IN EXCESS OF 400 LARGE, MEDIUM AND SMALL CANADIAN ENTERPRISES THAT GENERATED MORE THAN 82,000 HIGH TECH JOBS AND REVENUES IN EXCESS OF $22BILLION IN 2007. THE ASSOCIATION IS THE VOICE OF CANADA'S AEROSPACE INDUSTRY. AIAC ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS UNDERTAKES ADVOCACY, EXPORT PROMOTION AND EVENT PLANNING ACTIVITIES.
James Quick, PRESIDENT & CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2010-08-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (DFAITC) | $10,154.00 | Yes |
Address:
1200 - 60 QUEEN STREET
OTTAWA, ON K1P 5Y7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-232-4297
Fax number:
613-232-1142
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Aerospace Industries Association of Canada/Association des Industries Aérospatiales du Canada | 2024-05-02 | current |
Aerospace Industries Association of Canada/Association des Industries Aérospatiales du Canada | 2008-12-11 | 2024-05-02 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Mueller | 2021-02-01 | Current |
James Quick | 2011-06-23 | 2021-02-01 |
CLAUDE LAJEUNESSE | 2008-01-17 | 2011-06-23 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
External Affairs, Minister's Office |
1995 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Communications, Minister's Office |
1993 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Federal Provincial Relations Office, Constitutional Affairs |
1990 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
November 1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
External Affairs, Minister's Office |
1995 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Communications, Minister's Office |
1993 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Federal Provincial Relations Office, Constitutional Affairs |
1990 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
November 1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Officer
Office of the Secretary to the Governor General, Policy and Planning Division |
April 2003 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Natural Resources Canada, International Energy Division, Energy Policy Branch |
October 2002 to April 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Outreach
Leader of the Opposition, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
August 2006 to January 2007 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
September 2004 to November 2005 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Canadian International Development Agency, Office of the Minister |
February 1996 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Special Advisor, Quebec Region
Public Works and Government Services, Office of the Minister |
April 1995 to February 1996 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Human Resources Development Canada, Office of the Minister |
September 1990 to June 1998 | Not a designated office |