The Canadian Medical Association (CMA) is a national, voluntary association of physicians that advocates on behalf of its members and the public for access to high-quality health care. The CMA also provides leadership and guidance to physicians. The CMA was formed in Quebec City in 1867, just three months after the birth of Canada. It was created by 164 physicians who recognized the need for a national medical body. They selected Sir Charles Tupper, who would later serve as Canada's prime minister, as the first president. Today the CMA has more than 85,000 members, and advocates on behalf of both members and their patients — on Parliament Hill, during federal election campaigns and in the media. The CMA also takes the lead on public health issues. CMA’s Mission: Helping physicians care for patients. CMA’s Vision: The CMA will be the leader in engaging and serving physicians, and the national voice for the highest standards for health and health care.
Timothy Smith, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
1410 Blair Towers Place
Suite 500
Ottawa, ON K1J 9B9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-731-8610
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2024-03-01 | current |
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2008-10-07 | 2024-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Timothy Smith | 2013-12-08 | Current |
Paul-Émile Cloutier | 2009-07-20 | 2013-12-08 |
Barbara Drew | 2008-10-07 | 2009-07-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Service desk coordinator
Canadian Science and Technology Museum Corporation, N/A |
1999 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Tour Officer, NDP Leader's Office
House of Commons, NDP Leader's Office |
February 2019 to November 2019 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consultant, Medical Ethics
Canadian Armed Forces, Not applicable |
July 2003 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Receptionist
Department of Employment and Immigration, Office of the Minister of Employment and Immigration |
September 1980 to September 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Analyst, Senior Research Analyst
Statistics Canada, Health Division |
September 1978 to October 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Assistance
House of Commons, Office of Paul Dewar, Member of Parliament |
October 2012 to April 2014 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Denise Savoie, Member of Parliament and Deputy Speaker |
August 2011 to August 2012 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Secretary
National Capital Commission, Surveys and Mapping |
December 1989 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Social Policy Researcher
Crown-Indigenous Relations and Northern Affairs Canada, Policy and Strategic Direction |
January 2021 to December 2021 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
January 2018 to March 2018 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
June 2017 to October 2017 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
January 2015 to July 2015 | Not a designated office |
Junior Research and Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
May 2014 to August 2014 | Not a designated office |
Junior Research and Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
September 2013 to December 2013 | Not a designated office |
Program Officer
Canada Border Services Agency, Pre-Border Programs Directorate, Programs Branch |
January 2013 to April 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Secretary of State
Industry Canada, Office of the Secretary of State for Science, Research & Develo |
August 1995 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Maurizio Bevilacqua, Member of Parliament |
January 1991 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Paul Martin, Member of Parliament |
May 1989 to January 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legal and Policy Researcher and Program Manager
Royal Commission on New Reproductive Technologies, N/A |
April 1990 to May 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Intern
House of Commons, Office of Keith Martin, Member of Parliament |
September 2006 to February 2007 | Not a designated office |
Assistant coordinator
National Capital Commission, Welcome Centre |
April 2006 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant coordinator
National Capital Commission, Welcome Centre |
April 2005 to September 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Marketing Officer
National Arts Centre, Marketing Department |
January 2008 to April 2010 | Not a designated office |
Marketing Officer
Canadian Tourism Commission, N/A |
February 2003 to April 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Writer and Special Advisor
House of Commons, Speaker of the House of Commons, Prime Minster's Office |
1986 to 1993 | Not a designated office |