Total Number of Communication Reports: 108
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
The Canadian Foundation for Healthcare Improvement is dedicated to accelerating healthcare improvement and transformation for Canadians. We collaborate with governments, policy-makers, and health system leaders to convert evidence and innovative practices into actionable policies, programs, tools and leadership development.
Maureen O'Neil, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Agency for Drugs and Technologies in Health | $10,000.00 | No |
Canadian Health Human Resources Network | $6,032.50 | No |
Canadian Institute for Health Information | $20,070.00 | No |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $222,798.70 | Yes |
Canadian Partnership Against Cancer | $15,000.00 | No |
Canadian Patient Safety Institute | $5,000.00 | Yes |
Capital District Health Authority (Nova Scotia) | $30,100.00 | Yes |
Eastern Health (Newfoundland and Labrador) | $30,100.00 | Yes |
Fraser Health Authority (British Columbia) | $7,955.48 | Yes |
Health PEI | $30,100.00 | Yes |
Horizon Health Network | $30,100.00 | Yes |
Institute for Health System Sustainability | $7,955.48 | Yes |
Northern Health Authority (British Columbia) | $11,285.49 | Yes |
Northwest Territories Department of Health and Social Services | $33,874.38 | No |
Ontario Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care | $35,912.44 | Yes |
Réseau de santé Vitalité | $30,100.00 | Yes |
Saskatchewan Health | $72,940.71 | Yes |
Winnipeg Regional Health Authority | $40,027.41 | No |
Address:
Suite 700 1565 Carling Ave
Ottawa, ON K1Z 8R1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-728-2238
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Foundation for Healthcare Improvement/Fondation canadienne pour l'amélioration des services de santé | 2013-10-18 | 2019-04-29 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jennifer Zelmer | 2018-09-01 | 2019-04-29 |
Maureen O'Neil | 2013-10-18 | 2018-09-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Revenue Canada, Revenue Canada |
1989 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Office of the Minister of State (Federal Economic Development Initiative for Northern Ontario), Minister's office |
2004 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Gerald Keddy, Member of Parliament |
September 1997 to May 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Revenue Canada, Revenue Canada |
1989 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
President
International Development Research Council, President's office |
1997 to June 2008 | Not a designated office |
President (Interim)
International Centre for Human Rights and Democratic Development, President's office |
1996 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Coordinator
Status of Women Canada, None |
1986 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Director/Senior Policy Analyst, Policy Research and Strategic Planning Branch
Health and Welfare Canada, Social Programs Analysis Directorate |
1974 to 1978 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Social Programs
Communications Canada, Social Policy and Programs Branch |
1973 to 1974 | Not a designated office |
Program Analyst
Statistics Canada, Social Statistics |
1972 to 1972 | Not a designated office |
Research Associate
Ministry of State for Urban Affairs, None |
1970 to 1971 | Not a designated office |
Coordinator of Research
Secretary of State department, Task Force on Citizenship |
1970 to 1970 | Not a designated office |