NAV CANADA was incorporated on May 26, 1995 as a not-for-profit corporation under the Canada Corporations Act. The objectives of the company are to acquire, own, manage, operate and develop the Canadian air navigation system and services in and over Canada and in such international airspace the responsibility for which has been delegated to Canada pursuant to international agreement. Under the Civil Air Navigation Services Commercialization Act, the company has been granted the exclusive right and obligation to provide civil air traffic control, civil aeronautical information and specified flight information.
JOHN CRICHTON, PRESIDENT & CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
Adresse :
77 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa, ON K1P 5L6
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-563-7000
Numéro de fax :
613-563-3487
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
NAV CANADA | 2024-05-01 | actuel |
NAV CANADA | 2008-07-09 | 2024-05-01 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Raymond Bohn | 2021-01-01 | Actuel |
Neil Wilson | 2016-01-01 | 2021-01-01 |
JOHN CRICHTON | 1998-08-17 | 2016-01-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Acting Program Manager, Canadian Automated Air Traffic System Technical Training Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1996 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Canadian Automated Air Traffic System Technical Sytem Instructor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1994 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronics System Instructor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 à 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic System Analyst
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic System Technician
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1981 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Material Management
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services Transfer Team |
juillet 1996 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager, Area Control Centre Training
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1993 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Acting Training Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Instrument Flight Rules Course Director
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1990 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Instrument Flight Rules Instructor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Instrument Flight Rules Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1984 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Air Traffic Controller Training
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1984 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Control Tower Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1983 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Air Traffic Controller in Training
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1982 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1982 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Electronic Technologist, Gander, NL
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1980 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Summer Student
Public Service Commission, Financial Services Directorate |
mai 1985 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer Student
Public Services Commission, Financial Services Directorate |
mai 1984 à août 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager, Winnipeg Regional Air Traffic Services School
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1994 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Course Director, Winnipeg Regional Air Traffic Services School
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1985 à 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Instructor, Winnipeg Regional Air Traffic Services School
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1983 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Instrument Flight Rules Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1980 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Licensed Visual Flight Rules Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1977 à 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Operations Support Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1973 à 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Shift Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1993 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Unit Training Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Airt Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1972 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Office Manager
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Legal Department |
novembre 1991 à octobre 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Paralegal
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Legal Department |
mars 1989 à novembre 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1994 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 à 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Air Traffic Control Officer, Canadian Forces Base Trenton
Department of National Defence, Air Navigation Services |
1983 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Operational Requirements Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Operations Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager Area Control Centre Operations
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief, Quebec Units
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager of Software
Correctional Services, No Branch or Unit |
1983 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Project Manager
Transport Canada, Facilties, Equipment, Systems Department |
1980 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Software Engineer
Transport Canada, Facilities, Equipment, Systems Department |
1974 à 1979 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Air Advisor Canadian Defence Liaison Staff, London, England
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1992 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Safety
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1988 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Base Commander, Goose Bay
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1984 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Officer of Canadian Forces
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1965 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1993 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Flight Service Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chief
Transport Canada, Air Economic Evaluations Branch |
1995 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief, Surface
Transport Canada, Crown Corporations & Subsidies |
1991 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Economic Analyst
Transport Canada, Air Economic Evaluation Branch |
1990 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Analyst, User Impact
Transport Canada, Cost Recovery Branch |
1987 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Economic Analyst
Transport Canada, Air Economic Evaluation Branch |
1982 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Engineering Implementation Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1995 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Regional Superintendent Engineering Services, Ontario
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1990 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Regional Radar Modernization Project Duty Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Regional Engineering Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1983 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Engineer-in-Charge Terminal Services
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1978 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Terminal Services Engineer
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1977 à 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic Systems Engineer
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1973 à 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Maintenance Technologist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1970 à 1970 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Flight Service Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Acting Chief - Research Analysis and Special Programs Division
Transport Canada, Transportation Development Centre |
1997 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Ergonomist/Scientific Advisor/Project Manager
Transport Canada, Transportation Development Centre |
septembre 1992 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Ergonomist/Scientific Advisor/Inspector
Atomic Energy Control Board, No Branch or Unit |
octobre 1990 à août 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Health, Health Canada |
janvier 1996 à janvier 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Public Works and Government Special Services, Publics Work and Goverment Services Canada |
janvier 1994 à janvier 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Research Officer
Privy Council Office, Machinery of Goverment Secretariat |
juin 1992 à novembre 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student Employment Officer
Canada Employment Centre, Manpower Canada |
mai 1989 à août 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student Employment Officer
Canada Employment Centre, Manpower Canada |
mai 1988 à août 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Procedures Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1996 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Technical Training Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Instrument Flight Rules Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1980 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Communications Engineer, Technical Services Department
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1974 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager, Information Management
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services (Transport Canada Training Institute) |
octobre 1995 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Manager, Technology Support
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
octobre 1994 à octobre 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic Maintenance and Installation Technician
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
décembre 1990 à septembre 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic System Technician
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1985 à décembre 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller Shift Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Air Traffic Controller Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1985 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1979 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Project Manager, George A. Scott Centre, Cornwall Training Institute
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1994 à 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic System Instructor, Cornwall Training Institute
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1989 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic Instructor and Technician
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1987 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic Technician, Timmins Airport
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1983 à 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Acting Program Manager, Canadian Automated Air Traffic System Technical Training Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1996 à octobre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Canadian Automated Air Traffic System Technical Sytem Instructor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1994 à 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronics System Instructor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 à 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic System Analyst
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Electronic System Technician
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1981 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Procurement Officer
Department of Supply and Services, Procurement Office |
juin 1977 à septembre 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |