Enbridge is a Canadian energy transportation company, headquartered in Calgary, with significant assets in Canada and the United States . Enbridge also owns Canada's largest natural gas distribution company, Enbridge Gas Distribution Inc. Enbridge is also involved in the development of renewable energy sources such as wind power, solar power and stationary fuel cells.
Al Monaco, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
Suite 3000
425, 1st Street SW
Calgary, AB T2P 3L8
Canada
Telephone number:
403-718-3493
Fax number:
403-231-3954
Enbridge Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Enbridge Inc. | 2024-03-15 | current |
Enbridge Inc. | 2008-07-23 | 2024-03-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Greg Ebel | 2023-01-01 | Current |
Al Monaco | 2012-10-01 | 2023-01-01 |
Patrick Daniel | 2005-07-25 | 2012-10-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Policy
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the PC Prty of Canada |
1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director
House of Commons, PC Caucus Services |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to the Minister for Economic Diversification
Economic Diversification, Minister's office |
1988 to January 1991 | Not a designated office |
Student Coordination for the Student Job Centre
Employment and Immigration, Employment and Immigration |
1983 to 1983 | Not a designated office |