Total Number of Communication Reports: 70
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
To serve the interests of its member organizations by acting as the voice of the investment funds industry and providing services to its members that improve the regulatory framework, improve members' knowledge and proficiency, improve operating efficiencies of members businesses, enhance investor confidence and facilitate communication among members. More specifically, IFIC represents its members before governments and their agencies; collects and disseminates statistical information about the industry; supports and sponsors educational programs for participants in the industry; and contributes to the public understanding of the investment funds industry.
Paul Bourque, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
11 King Street, West
4th Floor
Toronto, ON M5H 4C7
Canada
Telephone number:
416-309-2300
Fax number:
416-861-9937
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The Investment Funds Institute of Canada/L'Institut des fonds d'investissement du Canada | 2024-05-14 | current |
The Investment Funds Institute of Canada/L'Institut des fonds d'investissement du Canada | 2009-06-05 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Andrew Mitchell | 2023-01-16 | Current |
Paul Bourque | 2016-07-18 | 2023-01-16 |
Joanne De Laurentiis | 2007-04-13 | 2016-07-18 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Legal Advisor
Department of Finance, Canadian Securities Transition Office |
2009 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
General Counsel
Department of Justice, Edmonton Office |
January 1995 to December 1995 | Not a designated office |