The Federation of Canadian Municipalities (FCM) has been recognized since 1901 as the national voice of municipal governments. It is dedicated to improving the quality of life from coast to coast. FCM represents the interests of all municipalities on policy and program matters within federal jurisdiction. Municipal governments constituting FCM's membership represent more than 25 million canadians. FCM members include Canada's largest cities, small urban and rural communities and the 18 major provincial and territorial municipal associations. Municipal leaders from all parts of Canada assemble annually to establish FCM policy on key issues. The National Board of Directors meets quarterly to review policy and program matters.
Brock Carlton, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2012-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada | $421,036.00 | Yes |
Canada Mortgage and Housing Corporation (CMHC) | $115,723.00 | No |
Canadian International Development Agency (CIDA) | $10,903,490.00 | Yes |
Environment Canada | $36,600.00 | No |
Status of Women Canada (SWC) | $325,478.00 | Yes |
Address:
24 Clarence Street
Ottawa, ON K1N 5P3
Canada
Telephone number:
613-907-6268
Fax number:
613-241-7440
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
FEDERATION OF CANADIAN MUNICIPALITIES/FÉDÉRATION CANADIENNE DES MUNICIPALITÉS | 2024-04-01 | current |
FEDERATION OF CANADIAN MUNICIPALITIES/FÉDÉRATION CANADIENNE DES MUNICIPALITÉS | 2008-07-31 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Carole Saab | 2020-06-22 | Current |
Brock Carlton | 2007-09-28 | 2020-06-22 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyst
Department of Justice Canada, Strategic Planning and Performance Management |
January 2008 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Program Manager
Canadian International Development Agency, Policy and/or Development |
January 1985 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyst
Department of Justice Canada, Strategic Planning and Performance Management |
January 2008 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs & President of the Queens Privy Council of Canada, Office of the Hon. Lucienne Robillard P.C., M.P. |
August 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor (Ontario)
Minister of Human Resources and Skills Development Canada (HRSDC) & Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs (MIGA), Office of the Hon. Lucienne Robillard P.C., M.P. |
January 2005 to July 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant for Ontario,
Minister of Citizenship and Immigration, Office of the Hon. Judy Sgro P.C., M.P. |
July 2004 to January 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Hon. Elinor Caplan, P.C. M.P., Minister of National Revenue |
September 2002 to June 2004 | Not a designated office |