Total Number of Communication Reports: 329
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
We will promote and assist in the development and use of the Trans Canada Trail, by supporting success at the local level in the continued improvement and enhancement of this national network. Our dream of a cross-country Trail is now a reality. Our bold goal, nearly 25 years in the making, was achieved with the help of our partners, donors and all levels of government. The Trans Canada Trail now consists of more than 28,000 kilometres of multi-use recreational trails, linking Canada and Canadians. Post-connection, our mission is now to continue to enhance and improve the Trail by garnering support and continuing to nurture valuable relationships with Trail enthusiasts and partners across the country.
Eleanor McMahon, President & CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $73,000.00 | Yes |
Parks Canada | $9,000,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
321 de la Commune West
Montreal, QC H2Y 2E1
Canada
Telephone number:
514-485-4341
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Trans Canada Trail/Sentier Transcanadien | 2015-06-09 | 2024-03-16 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Eleanor McMahon | 2020-03-26 | 2024-03-16 |
Deborah Apps | 2015-06-09 | 2020-03-17 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Health Canada, First Nations and Inuit Health Branch |
July 2012 to January 2013 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Legislative Initiatives
Health Canada, First Nations and Inuit Health Branch |
April 2011 to July 2012 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Office of Policy Development
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
August 2009 to April 2011 | Not a designated office |
Senior Regulatory Advisor
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
October 2008 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Legislative and Regulatory Affairs
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
February 2006 to October 2008 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Corporate Policy
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
October 2005 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
September 2002 to October 2005 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst, Legislative and Regulatory Affairs
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Policy Branch |
July 2001 to September 2002 | Not a designated office |
Regulatory Analyst, Legislative Services
Environment Canada, Canadian Wildlife Service |
January 2001 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |
Regulatory Analyst, Regulations and Compliance
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
January 2000 to January 2001 | Not a designated office |
Marketing Officer
Health Canada, Health Promotion and Programs Branch |
September 1999 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consultant
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade |
1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Political Staff
Parliament of Canada, Parliament |
1985 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Health Canada, First Nations and Inuit Health Branch |
July 2012 to January 2013 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Legislative Initiatives
Health Canada, First Nations and Inuit Health Branch |
April 2011 to July 2012 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Office of Policy Development
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
August 2009 to April 2011 | Not a designated office |
Senior Regulatory Advisor
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
October 2008 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Legislative and Regulatory Affairs
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
February 2006 to October 2008 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Corporate Policy
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
October 2005 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
September 2002 to October 2005 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst, Legislative and Regulatory Affairs
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Policy Branch |
July 2001 to September 2002 | Not a designated office |
Regulatory Analyst, Legislative Services
Environment Canada, Canadian Wildlife Service |
January 2001 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |
Regulatory Analyst, Regulations and Compliance
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
January 2000 to January 2001 | Not a designated office |
Marketing Officer
Health Canada, Health Promotion and Programs Branch |
September 1999 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |