The University of Victoria is one of Canada's leading universities. Our vision is to be a university of choice for outstanding students, faculty and staff from British Columbia, Canada and the world. We provide students and faculty with a unique learning environment, recognized for its commitment to research, scholarship and experiential learning, and for its outstanding social, cultural, artistic, environmental and athletic opportunities.
David Turpin, President and Vice-Chancellor
End date of the last completed financial year: 2011-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Foundation for Innovation | $20,959,000.00 | Yes |
Canada Research Chairs | $5,175,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $5,492,000.00 | Yes |
Foreign | $4,425,000.00 | Yes |
Health Canada (HC) | $258,000.00 | Yes |
Municipal | $110,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $14,663,000.00 | Yes |
Other federal | $32,475,000.00 | Yes |
Other provinces | $7,316,000.00 | Yes |
Provincial | $215,127,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $5,871,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
Administrative Services Building
PO Box 1700 STN CSC
Victoria, BC V8W 2Y2
Canada
Telephone number:
250-721-7002
Fax number:
250-721-8654
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
University of Victoria | 2023-12-11 | current |
University of Victoria | 2008-10-16 | 2023-12-11 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Kevin Hall | 2020-11-01 | Current |
Valerie Kuehne | 2020-10-09 | 2020-11-01 |
Jamie Cassels | 2013-07-01 | 2020-10-09 |
David Turpin | 2006-05-23 | 2013-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Advisor/Director
Prime Minister's Office, Appointments Secretariat |
2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Citizenship and Immigration, Minister's Office |
September 1999 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
House of Commons, National Liberal Caucus Research Bureau |
1998 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament, Parkdale High Park |
September 1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Advisor/Director
Prime Minister's Office, Appointments Secretariat |
2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Citizenship and Immigration, Minister's Office |
September 1999 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
House of Commons, National Liberal Caucus Research Bureau |
1998 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament, Parkdale High Park |
September 1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |