THE CENTRE FOR ISRAEL AND JEWISH AFFAIRS (CIJA) IS THE OFFICIAL REPRESENTATIVE ORGANIZATIONAL VOICE OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY OF CANADA. IT IS THE COMMUNITY'S PRIMARY VEHICLE FOR JEWISH COMMUNITY ADVOCACY EFFORTS, HELPING TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF JEWISH LIFE IN CANADA AND STRENGTHEN THE CANADA-ISRAEL RELATIONSHIP. THE CENTRE ACTS ON A BROAD RANGE OF MATTERS AFFECTING THE STATUS, RIGHTS AND WELFARE OF JEWS IN CANADA, AS WELL AS ON ISSUES OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND EQUALITY FOR ALL CANADIANS, AND ARTICULATES THE COMMUNITY'S PERSPECTIVES ON KEY ISSUES OF NATIONAL SCOPE AND SIGNIFICANCE REGARDING CANADA-ISRAEL RELATIONS, POLITICAL, LEGAL/ CONSTITUTIONAL, HUMAN RIGHTS, SOCIAL JUSTICE ISSUES, AND MATTERS OF PUBLIC POLICY. THE CENTRE IS DEVOTED TO THE PROMOTION OF INCREASED UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN THE PEOPLES OF CANADA AND ISRAEL. IN SEEKING TO ENHANCE CANADA-ISRAEL FRIENDSHIP, THE CENTRE LIAISES WITH GOVERNMENT, MEDIA, BUSINESS AND ACADEMIC SECTORS, OFTEN SUBMITTING BRIEFS AND PROVIDING BACKGROUND ANALYSES ON MATTERS OF PUBLIC POLICY. IN ADDITION, IT SPONSORS SEMINARS, CONFERENCES AND OTHER TYPES OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMING IN CANADA, AND ORGANIZES MIDDLE EAST STUDY MISSIONS AS WELL AS VISITS TO OTHER COMMUNITIES WHERE THERE ARE SPECIFIC ISSUES RELEVANT TO THE JEWISH COMMUNITY.
SHIMON FOGEL, Chief Executive Officer (CEO)
Address:
45 O'Connor Street, Suite 730
Ottawa, ON K1P 1A4
Canada
Telephone number:
613-234-8271
Fax number:
613-563-9379
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The Centre for Israel and Jewish Affairs/Le Centre consultatif des relations juives et israéliennes | 2024-04-02 | current |
The Centre for Israel and Jewish Affairs/Le Centre consultatif des relations juives et israéliennes | 2012-03-27 | 2024-04-02 |
CANADA-ISRAEL COMMITTEE | 2008-08-12 | 2012-03-27 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Advisor
Public Service, Minister of Foreign Affairs |
August 2004 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Public Service, Prime Minister's office |
January 2004 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
Public service, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
1986 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
Public service, Member of Parliament David Bergen |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member of Parliament
Political Party, Bloc Quebecois Caucus |
June 1997 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's Office |
July 2009 to February 2010 | February 18, 2010 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Officer - Major
Department of National Defence, Canadian Armed Forces (Army)- Primary Reserve |
April 2016 Footnote 3 | Not a designated office |
Officer - Major
Department of National Defence, Canadian Armed Forces (Army)- Primary Reserve |
July 2010 to April 2016 | Not a designated office |
Officer- Second-Lieutenant/Lieutenant/Captain
Department of National Defence, Canadian Armed Forces (Army)- Primary Reserve Cameron Highlanders of Ottawa (Inf |
April 1998 to July 2010 | Not a designated office |