Imagine Canada is a federally-incorporated not-for-profit corporation and a registered charity. Imagine Canada is a national intermediary organization drawing its membership from all 10 provinces and three territories, with offices in Toronto, Ottawa and Calgary and employing approximately 25 staff. It is mandated to foster effective and sustainable charitable and non-profit organizations. Imagine Canada's goals are, broadly, to improve contributions to community from all sectors of society, to strengthen individual charities and non-profit organizations and to promote trust and collaboration among those working to build community. Its activities include promoting public policy and a regulatory environment that is supportive of the work of the charitable and non-profit sector, researching issues related to the sector, encouraging corporate community contributions, and providing resources and tools to enhance the capacity of sector organizations.
Bruce MacDonald, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2016-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $7,930.00 | Yes |
Employment Ontario | $18,925.00 | No |
Address:
65 St. Clair Avenue East
Suite 700
Toronto, ON M4T 2Y3
Canada
Telephone number:
416-597-2293
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Imagine Canada | 2024-05-17 | current |
Imagine Canada | 2010-03-19 | 2024-05-17 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bruce MacDonald | 2014-07-14 | Current |
MARCEL LAUZIERE | 2010-03-19 | 2014-07-14 |
Georgina Steinsky-Schwartz | 2006-04-06 | 2008-06-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Jean-Francois Larose, MP |
November 2014 to August 2015 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister
Natural Resources Canada, Strategic Policy Sector |
2006 to April 2007 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Natural Resources Canada, Canadian Forest Service |
September 2003 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Vice-President
CIDA, Policy |
January 2000 to September 2003 | Not a designated office |
Commissioner of the Environment and Sustainable Development
Office of the Auditor General of Canada, Commissioner of the Environment and Sustainable Development |
August 1996 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Environment Canada, Corporate Policy Group |
1992 to September 1995 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Environment Canada, Policy Directorate |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Department of Energy, Mines and Resources, Energy Strategy and International Affairs Branch |
March 1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Director General
Department of Energy, Mines and Resources, Corporate Development and Economic Analysis Branch |
1982 to July 1984 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director General
Department of Energy, Mines and Resources, Special Studies Branch |
1981 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Electrical Policy Analysis
Department of Energy, Mines and Resources, Special Studies Branch |
1979 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Advisor, Economics and the Environment
Environment Canada, Environment Canada |
August 1973 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor to the Minister
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Minister's Office |
August 1999 to October 2000 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant to Robert Nault, MP
Parliament, House of Commons |
September 1995 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant to Ron MacDonald, MP
Parliament, House of Commons |
June 1993 to July 1994 | Not a designated office |
Census Commissioner
Statistics Canada, Census Office, London, Ontario |
April 1991 to July 1991 | Not a designated office |