A public university operating on 2 major campuses.UBC's Vision for the 21st Century: The University of British Columbia, aspiring to be one of the world's best universities, will prepare students to become exceptional global citizens, promote the values of a civil and sustainable society, and conduct outstanding research to serve the people of British Columbia, Canada, and the world.
Stephen Toope, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2008-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
1. Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council | $10,346,000.00 | Yes |
10. Other provinces (Not BC) | $1,128,000.00 | Yes |
11. Foreign | $9,032,000.00 | Yes |
2. Health Canada | $1,849,000.00 | Yes |
3. Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council | $46,847,000.00 | Yes |
4. Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $74,545,000.00 | Yes |
5. Canada Foundation for Innovation (CFI) | $11,533,000.00 | Yes |
6. Canada Research Chairs | $20,548,000.00 | Yes |
7. Other federal | $50,220,000.00 | Yes |
8. Provincial (BC) | $782,345,000.00 | Yes |
9. Municipal | $831,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
6328 Memorial Road
Vancouver, BC V6T 1Z2
Canada
Telephone number:
604-822-3375
Fax number:
604-822-8201
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The University of British Columbia | 2024-04-02 | current |
The University of British Columbia | 2008-07-02 | 2024-04-02 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Benoit-Antoine Bacon | 2023-11-01 | Current |
Deborah Buszard | 2022-10-14 | 2023-11-01 |
Santa Ono | 2016-08-15 | 2022-10-14 |
Martha Piper | 2015-09-01 | 2016-08-15 |
Arvind Gupta | 2014-08-14 | 2015-09-01 |
Stephen Toope | 2006-08-04 | 2014-08-14 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Ethics consultant
Correctional Services Canada, Regional Treatment Centre, Abbotsford, BC |
April 2005 to March 2008 | Not a designated office |
Contract researcher
Royal Commission on New Reproductive Technologies, not applicable |
1991 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
summer student casual employee
not applicable, not applicable |
1975 to 1975 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Acting Communications Director and Chief of Publication Services
Forestry Canada, not applicable |
1991 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Communications Officer
Canada Centre for Inland Waters, not applicable |
1991 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Freshwater Institute |
1985 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Co-op Student
Department of Indian Affairs & Northern Development, Communications & Public Affairs |
May 1994 to December 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Western Economic Diversification Environmental Policy and Technology Advisor
Western Economic Diversification, Vancouver Branch |
December 2003 to October 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Undergraduate Research Assistant
Agriculture Canada, not applicable |
May 1973 to August 1973 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Filing Clerk, summer
Revenue Canada, Customs and Excise |
1992 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Filing Clerk, summer
Revenue Canada, Customs and Excise |
1991 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
T.D. MacDonald Chair in Industrial Economics
Industry Canada, Competition Bureau |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Biotechnology and Industry
Natural Resources Canada, Canadian Forest Service |
1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Research Associate
National Research Council of Canada, Division of Biological Sciences |
1978 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student
National Research Council, Prairie Regional Lab |
May 1970 to August 1970 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Financial Clerk, summer
Public Works, Hull: Printing and Publishing, Supplies and Services |
1975 to 1975 | Not a designated office |
Financial Clerk, summer
Public Works, Hull: Printing and Publishing, Supplies and Services |
1974 to 1974 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
constituency office assistant
Member of Parliament Office, Vancouver Quadra, House of Commons |
February 2002 to March 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Official Opposition Critic for Democratic Reform
Parliament, House of Commons |
February 2006 to July 2007 | Not a designated office |
Minister of State (Sport)
Parliament, Canadian Heritage |
July 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Western Economic Diversification
Parliament, Western Economic Diversification |
July 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Public Works and Government Services
Parliament, Public Works and Government Services |
December 2003 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Secretary of State Indian Affairs and Northern Development
Parliament, Department of Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
January 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Justice and Attorney General
Parliament, Department of Justice |
September 2001 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Liberal Party of Canada Member of Parliament Vancouver Quadra
Parliament, House of Commons |
November 2000 to July 2007 | Not a designated office |
2000 Project Director for the Review of Consultative and Decison-Making processes in the Pacific Fisheries
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, not applicable |
2000 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Advisor on War Affected Children in Northern Uganda civil war
Canadian International Development Agency, not applicable |
2000 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Commissioner and Vice President
Law Commission of Canada, not applicable |
2000 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Special Legal Advisor
Commission for Environmental Cooperation, Montreal, not applicable |
1999 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Canadian Representative
Trilateral Review Committee for North American Agreement on Environmental Cooperation, not applicable |
1998 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Consulatant
Canadian International Development Agency, Sri Lanka2000, Uganda2000, Phillippines1999, Brazil1998, Cuba1997, Vietnam1997 |
1997 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Co Chair
National Judicial Workload Committee, not applicable |
1996 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Consultant
Canadian International Development Agency, Vietnam1996,1995,Cambodia1996,Ethiopia1999,1998,1995,1994,1993,Thailand 1997 |
1993 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Officer
National Research Council, Institute for Microstructural Sciences |
October 1983 to November 1992 | Not a designated office |