EPCOR Utilities Inc. is an integrated Utility providing power (electricity) and water/wastewater services to customers across British Columbia, Alberta, Ontario and regions of the United States
Don Lowry, President & CEO
Address:
10065 Jasper Avenue
18th Floor
Edmonton, AB T5J 3B1
Canada
Telephone number:
780-412-3268
Fax number:
780-412-3096
EPCOR Utilities Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
EPCOR Utilities Inc. | 2024-04-02 | current |
EPCOR Utilities Inc. | 2008-07-21 | 2024-04-02 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
John Elford | 2023-05-03 | Current |
Stuart Lee | 2015-09-01 | 2023-05-03 |
David Stevens | 2013-04-01 | 2015-09-01 |
Don Lowry | 2006-08-14 | 2013-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
2nd lieutenant
Military, Air Force (Pilot Training) |
1995 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Officer Cadet
Military, Royal Military College |
1991 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant to the Minister
House of Commons, Minister of Western Economic Diversification |
June 1993 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor to the Minister
House of Commons, Minister of Industry, Science and Technology Canada |
September 1992 to November 1992 | Not a designated office |
Western Desk
Progressive Conservative Caucus, Progressive Conservative Caucus Services |
April 1992 to September 1992 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant (Western Canada & Tour) to the Minister
House of Commons, Office of the Minister of Industry, Science and Technology and Minister of Inter |
September 1991 to April 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Officer Cadet
Navy, Royal Roads/Royal Military College |
1977 to 1981 | Not a designated office |