Founded in 1913, the Canadian Pulp and Paper Association changed its name to the Forest Products Association of Canada (FPAC) in February 2001. FPAC is the voice of Canada's wood, pulp, and paper producers nationally and internationally in government, trade, and environmental affairs. Canada's forest products industry is a 58 billion dollar a year industry and represents almost 12 percent of Canada's manufacturing GDP. The industry is one of Canada's largest employers, operating in 200 Canadian communities and providing 235,000 direct jobs across the country. L’Association canadienne des pâtes et papiers a été fondé en 1913. En février 2001 le nom fût changé à l’Association des produits forestiers du Canada. L’Association des produits forestiers du Canada (APFC) est le porte-parole, au Canada et à l’étranger, des producteurs canadiens de bois, de pâte et de papier pour les questions touchant le gouvernement, le commerce et l’environnement. L’industrie canadienne des produits forestiers a un chiffre d'affaires de 58 milliards de dollars par année qui représente 12 % du PIB manufacturier. Il s’agit de l’un des plus gros employeurs du pays, qui a des activités dans 200 collectivités canadiennes et procure 235 000 emplois directs d’un océan à l’autre.
Derek Nighbor, CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2018-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $261,357.19 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $363,003.44 | No |
Address:
410-99 BANK STREET
410-99, rue Bank
OTTAWA, ON K1P 6B9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-1441
Ext.
308
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Forest Products Association of Canada/Association des produits forestiers du Canada | 2024-05-15 | current |
Forest Products Association of Canada/Association des produits forestiers du Canada | 2009-10-30 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Derek Nighbor | 2016-03-07 | Current |
Paul Lansbergen | 2015-12-18 | 2016-03-07 |
David Lindsay | 2012-09-01 | 2015-12-18 |
CATHERINE COBDEN | 2012-04-01 | 2012-09-01 |
AVRIM LAZAR | 2002-05-23 | 2012-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Al Johnson, MP, Calgary North |
1990 to February 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Advisor, Species at Risk
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Habitat Program Policy Branch |
March 2007 to June 2007 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student, Tree Pathology
Natural Resources Canada, Canadian Forest Service, Pacific Forestry Centre |
May 2001 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student, Tree Pathology
Natural Resources Canada, Canadian Forest Service, Pacific Forestry Centre |
May 2000 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special projects
Global Affairs Canada, International Education Marketing |
February 1999 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |
Contract administrative assistant
Transport Canada, Safety and security |
January 1999 to February 1999 | Not a designated office |
Student contract
Revenue Canada, Assessment, benefit and service branch |
September 1994 to December 1997 | Not a designated office |
Student contract
National Archives, Photography Services |
May 1994 to August 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Advisor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, United States Trade Policy and Environment Divisions from |
1994 to February 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager
Environment Canada, Waste Program |
September 2007 to March 2011 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director
Environment Canada, Consumer Products Division |
February 2007 to September 2007 | Not a designated office |
Manager
Health Canada, Industrial Sectors |
September 2006 to February 2007 | Not a designated office |
Section Head
Environment Canada, Pulp and Paper |
August 2004 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Process Engineer
Environment Canada, Pulp and Paper |
July 2003 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Process Engineer
Environment Canada, Water Section |
June 2002 to July 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Junior Policy Analyst - Federal Student Work Experience Program
Environment Canada, International Affairs Branch (North America) |
May 2014 to May 2015 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Al Johnson, MP, Calgary North |
1990 to February 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Project Officer
Environment Canada, Environmental Stewardship Branch |
May 2010 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |
Studen
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Eastern Cereal and Oilseed Research Centre |
September 2009 to December 2009 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer
Environment Canada, Environmental Stewardship Branch |
May 2008 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |