NOVA Chemicals Corporation's principal business is the production and marketing of petrochemicals. NOVA Chemicals Corporation is Canada's largest petrochemicals company and among North America's top producers of ethylene, polyethylene, styrene and polystyrene.
Randy G. Woelfel, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
1000 Seventh Avenue SW
PO Box 2518, Station M
Calgary, AB T2P 5C6
Canada
Telephone number:
403-750-3600
Fax number:
403-750-4870
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
NOVA Chemicals Corporation | 2024-04-15 | current |
NOVA Chemicals Corporation | 2008-07-16 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Roger Kearns | 2023-06-12 | Current |
Danny Dweik | 2022-10-01 | 2023-06-12 |
Luis Sierra | 2020-08-01 | 2022-10-01 |
Todd Karran | 2014-05-01 | 2020-08-01 |
Randy G. Woelfel | 2009-11-16 | 2014-05-01 |
Christopher Pappas | 2009-05-01 | 2009-11-16 |
Jeff Lipton | 2007-03-14 | 2009-05-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Industry Development Officer, Oil & Gas
Industry Canada, Energy & Marine Branch |
February 2001 to February 2002 | Not a designated office |
Industry Development Officer
Industry Canada, Aerospace & Defence Branch |
July 1999 to February 2001 | Not a designated office |
International Markets Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs & International Trade, Canada Market Research Centre/Market Support Division |
September 1997 to July 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Department of Agriculture, Office of the Honourable Bill Knight |
April 1991 to June 1992 | Not a designated office |
Special Projects Manager
Department of Defence, Office of the Honourable Bill McKnight |
September 1990 to April 1991 | Not a designated office |