The Prospectors and Developers Association of Canada (PDAC) is a national association representing the interests of the mineral exploration and development industry.
Ross Gallinger, Executive Director
Address:
135 King Street East
Toronto, ON M5C 1G6
Canada
Telephone number:
416-362-1969
Ext.
222
Fax number:
416-362-0101
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Prospectors and Developers Association of Canada/Association canadienne des prospecteurs et entrepreneurs | 2024-06-10 | current |
Prospectors and Developers Association of Canada/Association canadienne des prospecteurs et entrepreneurs | 2008-06-26 | 2024-06-10 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Lisa McDonald | 2017-11-13 | Current |
Andrew Cheatle | 2015-02-12 | 2017-11-13 |
Steven Virtue | 2014-06-23 | 2015-02-12 |
Ross Gallinger | 2011-08-15 | 2014-06-23 |
Anthony Andrews | 2006-10-31 | 2011-08-15 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Canadian Armed Forces, Officer
Department of National Defence, Logistics |
June 1986 to March 2001 | Not a designated office |