Janssen Inc. is a subsidiary of US based Johnson & Johnson and is bio pharmaceutical company focused on the sales, marketing and distribution of innovative medicines. Janssen Inc. has no subsidiary companies, although another entity, Johnson & Johnson (Canada) Inc., which is also registered to lobby federally, may have a direct interest in its lobbying.
Berkeley Vincent, President
Address:
19 Green Belt Drive
Toronto, ON M3C 1L9
Canada
Telephone number:
416-382-4856
Janssen Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Janssen Inc./ | 2024-04-01 | current |
Janssen Inc./ | 2010-12-13 | 2024-04-01 |
Janssen Ortho Inc | 2008-08-01 | 2010-12-13 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Berkeley Vincent | 2022-11-01 | Current |
Alaine Grand | 2022-07-23 | 2022-11-01 |
Jorge Bartolome | 2019-09-03 | 2022-07-23 |
Chris Halyk | 2006-12-18 | 2019-09-03 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs/Executive Assistant to the Leader of the Opposition
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
July 2009 to May 2010 | May 31, 2010 |
Executive Assistant to the Prime Minister
Prime Minister's Office, PMO |
December 2003 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant to the Minister of Finance
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister of Finance |
January 2000 to June 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs/Executive Assistant to the Leader of the Opposition
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
July 2009 to May 2010 | May 31, 2010 |
Executive Assistant to the Prime Minister
Prime Minister's Office, PMO |
December 2003 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant to the Minister of Finance
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister of Finance |
January 2000 to June 2002 | Not a designated office |