Serving customers for 200 years and counting, BMO is a highly diversified financial services provider - the 8th largest bank, by assets, in North America. With total assets of $971 billion as of July 31, 2021, and a team of diverse and highly engaged employees, BMO provides a broad range of personal and commercial banking, wealth management and investment banking products and services to more than 12 million customers and conducts business through three operating groups: Personal and Commercial Banking, BMO Wealth Management and BMO Capital Markets.
Darryl White, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
24th Floor, One First Canadian Place
Toronto, ON M5X 1A1
Canada
Telephone number:
416-867-4711
Fax number:
416-867-5460
BMO Financial Group / BMO Groupe financier is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
BMO Financial Group/BMO Groupe financier | 2024-05-15 | current |
BMO Financial Group/BMO Groupe financier | 2008-07-11 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Darryl White | 2017-11-01 | Current |
William Downe | 2007-03-19 | 2017-11-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member of Parliament
House of Commons, Bonavista – Trinity – Conception |
January 2001 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Industry; Minister of the Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency; Minister of Western Economic Diversification; Minister responsible for the Economic Development Agency of Canada for the Regions of Quebec
Department of Industry, Office of the Minister |
October 2000 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
House of Commons, Humber – St. Barbe – Baie Verte |
January 1994 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Fisheries and Oceans
Department of Fisheries and Oceans, Office of the Minister |
November 1993 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
House of Commons, Humber – St. Barbe – Baie Verte |
December 1988 to September 1993 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
House of Commons, Humber – Port au Port – St. Barbe |
November 1984 to October 1988 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Fisheries and Oceans
Department of Fisheries and Oceans, Office of the Minister |
October 1981 to February 1984 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
House of Commons, Humber – Port au Port – St. Barbe |
April 1980 to July 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Junior Policy Officer
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Regional Trade Policy |
May 2010 to December 2010 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Science and Technology, Office of the Minister of State |
May 2009 to September 2009 | September 4, 2009 |
Intern
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister |
May 2008 to September 2008 | September 5, 2008 |
Intern
Office of the Member of Parliament for St Catharines, House of Commons |
September 2007 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |