Air Canada is Canada's largest domestic and international full-service air carrier and the largest provider of scheduled passenger services in the domestic market, the transborder market and each of the Canada-Europe, Canada-Pacific, Canada-Caribbean/Central America and Canada-South American markets. Passenger transportation is the principle business. Air Canada is headquartered in Montreal.
CALIN ROVINESCU, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
P.O. Box 14,000
Station Airport
Dorval, QC H4Y 1H4
Canada
Telephone number:
514-422-7700
Fax number:
514-422-4945
Air Canada does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Air Canada | 2024-05-14 | current |
Air Canada | 2008-08-14 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Rousseau | 2021-02-15 | Current |
CALIN ROVINESCU | 2009-04-01 | 2021-02-15 |
Montie Brewer | 2007-03-02 | 2009-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Departmental Liaison
Canadian Heritage, Minister's Office |
November 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Project Manager
Social Development Canada, Executive and Ministerial Services |
November 2004 to November 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to the Minister
Canadian Heritage, Office of the Minister |
September 1999 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Press Secretary and Legislative Assistant to the Honourable Sheila Copps
Minister's Office, Heritage Canada |
November 1993 to December 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Departmental Liaison
Canadian Heritage, Minister's Office |
November 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Project Manager
Social Development Canada, Executive and Ministerial Services |
November 2004 to November 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to the Minister
Canadian Heritage, Office of the Minister |
September 1999 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Secretary of State Rural Development & Fednor, Minister's Office |
March 2001 to February 2003 | Not a designated office |