Air Canada is Canada's largest domestic and international full-service air carrier and the largest provider of scheduled passenger services in the domestic market, the transborder market and each of the Canada-Europe, Canada-Pacific, Canada-Caribbean/Central America and Canada-South American markets. Passenger transportation is the principle business. Air Canada is headquartered in Montreal.
CALIN ROVINESCU, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
P.O. Box 14,000
Station Airport
Dorval, QC H4Y 1H4
Canada
Telephone number:
514-422-7700
Fax number:
514-422-4945
Air Canada is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Air Canada does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Air Canada | 2024-05-14 | current |
Air Canada | 2008-08-14 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Rousseau | 2021-02-15 | Current |
CALIN ROVINESCU | 2009-04-01 | 2021-02-15 |
Montie Brewer | 2007-03-02 | 2009-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs & President of the Queens Privy Council of Canada, Office of the Hon. Lucienne Robillard P.C., M.P. |
August 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor (Ontario)
Minister of Human Resources & Skills Development Canada & Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs, Office of the Hon. Lucienne Robillard P.C., M.P. |
January 2005 to July 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant for Ontario
Minister of Citizenship & Immigration, Office of the Hon. Judy Sgro P.C., M.P. |
July 2004 to January 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Hon. Elinor Caplan, P.C., M.P., Minister of National Revenue |
September 2002 to June 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief of Staff
PMO, PMO |
August 2010 to August 2012 | August 10, 2012 |
Chief of Staff
Finance Canada, Finance Canada |
August 2007 to June 2010 | June 30, 2010 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student
Health Canada, Minister's Office |
May 1998 to August 1998 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Health Canada, Minister's Office |
May 1997 to August 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs & President of the Queens Privy Council of Canada, Office of the Hon. Lucienne Robillard P.C., M.P. |
August 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor (Ontario)
Minister of Human Resources & Skills Development Canada & Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs, Office of the Hon. Lucienne Robillard P.C., M.P. |
January 2005 to July 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant for Ontario
Minister of Citizenship & Immigration, Office of the Hon. Judy Sgro P.C., M.P. |
July 2004 to January 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Hon. Elinor Caplan, P.C., M.P., Minister of National Revenue |
September 2002 to June 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Communications Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Hon. John Baird |
January 2007 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
October 2002 to April 2003 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Immigration Officer
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Pearson International Airport |
June 2002 to April 2004 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
November 2001 to March 2002 | Not a designated office |