ALPA WAS FOUNDED IN 1931. IT IS AFFILIATED WITH THE AMERICAN FEDERATION OF LABOR-CONGRESS OF INDUSTRIAL ORGANIZATIONS (AFL-CIO) AND THE CANADIAN LABOUR CONGRESS (CLC).ALPA ACTIVELY PROMOTES AND CHAMPIONS ALL ASPECTS OF AVIATION SAFETY AND SECURITY THROUGHOUT ALL SEGMENTS OF THE AVIATION COMMUNITY. IT REPRESENTSTHE COLLECTIVE INTERESTS OF PILOTS IN COMMERCIAL AVIATION; SERVES AS THE COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AGENT ON BEHALF OF ALL PILOTS REPRESENTED BY THE ASSOCIATION; AND PROMOTES THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF THE MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION BEFORE PARLIAMENT, GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTS AND AGENCIES. ALPA IS A STRONG AND FORCEFUL ADVOCATE OF THE AIRLINE PILOTING PROFESSION, THROUGH ALL FORMS OF MEDIA, AND WITH THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; AND IS THE ULTIMATE GUARDIAN AND DEFENDER OF THE RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES OF THE PROFESSIONAL PILOTS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION. THE ASSOCIATION'S HEADQUARTERS ARE IN WASHINGTON, D.C., AND THE INTERNATIONAL PRESIDENT IS CAPTAIN JOHN PRATER.IN CANADA, ALPA REPRESENTS APPROXIMATELY 2,300 PILOTS AT Eight AIRLINES: AIR TRANSAT, AIR CANADA JAZZ, KELOWNA FLIGHTCRAFT, BEARSKIN, CANJET, WASAYA AND CALM AIR and First Air. THE Eight AIRLINE ALPA COUNCILS TOGETHER FORM THE CANADA BOARD WHOSE CURRENT PRESIDENT IS CAPTAIN DAN ADAMUS. THE CANADA BOARD OFFICE IS LOCATED IN OTTAWA.ALPA CANADA IS A MEMBER OF THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF AIR LINE PILOTS ASSOCIATIONS (IFALPA), AN ORGANIZATION MADE UP OF PILOT ASSOCIATIONS FROM OVER 90 COUNTRIES WORLDWIDE AND THE VOICE OF PILOTS TO THE INTERNATIONAL CIVIL AVIATION ORGANIZATION (ICAO).
allister ogilvie, Legal and Government Affairs Representative
Adresse :
155 Queen St., Suite 1301
Ottawa, ON K1P 6L1
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-569-5668
Poste
224
Numéro de fax :
613-569-5681
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Air Line Pilots Association, International/Association des Pilotes de Ligne, Internationale | 2024-07-08 | actuel |
Air Line Pilots Association, International/Association des Pilotes de Ligne, Internationale | 2008-08-11 | 2024-07-08 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Ann Matejicka | 2021-04-26 | Actuel |
Kevin Psutka | 2016-05-26 | 2021-04-26 |
allister ogilvie | 2007-04-19 | 2016-05-26 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.