Promote an understanding of the Canadian banking industry, work with others to ensure the legal and regulatory framework governing banks operates in an effecient and effective manner, and help in the development of industry standards.
Terry Campbell, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
199 Bay Street
Commerce Court West
Toronto, ON M5L 1G2
Canada
Telephone number:
416-362-6092
Fax number:
416-362-7708
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Bankers Association/Association des Banquiers Canadiens | 2024-04-02 | current |
Canadian Bankers Association/Association des Banquiers Canadiens | 2008-07-25 | 2024-04-02 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Anthony Ostler | 2022-02-28 | Current |
Angelina Mason | 2021-12-23 | 2022-02-28 |
Neil Parmenter | 2017-05-01 | 2021-12-23 |
Terry Campbell | 2011-03-01 | 2017-05-01 |
Nancy Hughes Anthony | 2007-05-30 | 2011-03-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Health Canada, Office of the Minister of Health |
March 2006 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Treasury Board Secretariat, Corporate Governance Directorate |
July 2006 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant - Canadian Food Inspection Agency
Minister of Agriculture and Agri-food Canada, Minister's Office |
September 2005 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament |
September 2001 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Policy Intern
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Canadian Mission to the Organization of American States (OAS) |
September 1999 to December 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Investigations Officer
Revenue Canada, Taxation |
June 1979 to April 1982 | Not a designated office |
Field Auditor
Revenue Canada, Taxation |
May 1978 to June 1979 | Not a designated office |
Office Auditor
Revenue Canada, Taxation |
November 1977 to May 1978 | Not a designated office |
Assessing Officer
Revenue Canada, Taxation |
July 1977 to November 1977 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Acting Director, Economics Division
Library of Parliament, Parliamentary Research Branch |
March 1999 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Analyst, Economics Division
Library of Parliament, Parliamentary Research Branch |
March 1989 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Research Officer, Economics Division
Library of Parliament, Parliamentary Research Branch |
August 1979 to March 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economist
Department of Finance Canada, Financial Sector Policy Division - Financial Crimes - Domestic Economist |
July 2003 to December 2004 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Department of Finance Canada, Financial Sector Policy Division - Financial Stability Section |
December 2002 to July 2003 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Department of Finance Canada, Financial Institutions Division - Structural Issues Section |
July 2000 to December 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Health Canada, Office of the Minister of Health |
March 2006 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister of Transport |
March 2003 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications and Senior Policy Advisor
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister of Transport |
June 2000 to March 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister of Transport |
June 1997 to June 2000 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Honourable David Collenette, M.P. |
October 1996 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
National Defense, Office of the Minister of National Defence |
January 1996 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Contact Collections Officer
Revenue Canada, North York District Office |
July 1993 to December 1995 | Not a designated office |