Scientific affairs; Commercial operations; and administrative activities in biotechnology sector.
Daniel Billen, Vice President & General Manager
Address:
6755 Mississauga Road
Mississauga, ON L5N 7Y2
Canada
Telephone number:
416-643-6817
Amgen Canada Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Amgen Canada Inc. | 2024-04-01 | current |
Amgen Canada Inc. | 2008-07-02 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Ugur Gunaydin | 2022-06-06 | Current |
Roman Stampfli | 2022-01-17 | 2022-06-06 |
Brian Heath | 2019-10-14 | 2022-01-17 |
Francesco Di Marco | 2017-10-26 | 2019-10-14 |
Helen Jordan | 2014-05-02 | 2017-10-26 |
Anand Varadan | 2011-09-13 | 2014-05-02 |
Daniel Billen | 2007-05-16 | 2011-09-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs |
November 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Ministry of International Trade, Ministry of International Trade |
January 2004 to November 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs |
November 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Ministry of International Trade, Ministry of International Trade |
January 2004 to November 2005 | Not a designated office |