The Canadian Life and Health Insurance Association Inc. (CLHIA) exists to serve its members in areas of common interest, need or concern. In carrying out this mission, the Association ensures that the views and interests of its diverse membership and of the public are equitably addressed. The CLHIA is guided by seven strategic objectives that drive all of its work, the three leading ones being: to build consensus among members on issues and concerns of importance to the industry; to promote a legislative and regulatory environment in Canada favourable to the business of its members; and to foster sound and equitable principles in the conduct of the business of its members.
Frank Swedlove, President
Address:
1 Queen Street East
Suite 1700
Toronto, ON M5C 2X9
Canada
Telephone number:
416-777-2221
Fax number:
416-777-1221
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Life and Health Insurance Association Inc./Association canadienne des compagnies d'assurances de personnes inc. | 2024-04-03 | current |
Canadian Life and Health Insurance Association Inc./Association canadienne des compagnies d'assurances de personnes inc. | 2009-08-28 | 2024-04-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Stephen Frank | 2017-07-01 | Current |
Frank Swedlove | 2007-07-30 | 2017-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister
Financial Sector Policy Branch, Department of Finance |
2003 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
General Director
Financial Sector Policy Branch, Department of Finance |
2000 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director
Financial Sector Review Group, Department of Finance |
1998 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Director
Financial Sector Division, Department of Finance |
1993 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Chief
Financial Institutions Division, Department of Finance |
1985 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Director for Canadianization
Mines and Resources, Department of Energy |
1981 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Library of Parliament, Research Branch |
1974 to 1974 | Not a designated office |
Chief
Foreign Investment Review Agency, Policy Branch |
1974 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Combines Officer
Bureau of Competition, Department of Consumer and Corporate Affairs |
1973 to 1974 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Principal Clerk
House of Commons, Table Research Branch |
2005 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Chair
House of Commons, Members' Orientation and Election Readiness Program |
2005 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Principal Clerk
House of Commons, Information Management |
2004 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Principal Clerk
House of Commons, Table Research Branch |
2002 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Principal Clerk
House of Commons, PRISM Office |
2002 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Procedural Clerk
House of Commons, Committee and Parliamentary Associations |
1993 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Procedural Clerk
House of Commons, Legislative Counsel Office |
1993 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Clerk
House of Commons, Public Bills Office |
October 1991 to January 1992 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Speaker of the House of Commons |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Deputy Clerk's Offices |
November 1988 to March 1989 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
Elections Canada, Registrar of Political Parties |
October 1988 to October 1988 | Not a designated office |
Committee Clerk
House of Commons, Committees Directorate |
1986 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Procedural Clerk
House of Commons, Table Research Branch |
1985 to January 1986 | Not a designated office |
Statistical Analyst
House of Commons, Committees and Private Legislation Branch |
March 1982 to July 1982 | Not a designated office |
Indexer Analyst
House of Commons, Index and Reference Branch |
1982 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Solicitor General Canada, Solicitor General's Office |
1978 to 1978 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Statistics Canada, Special Surveys, Ottawa |
1977 to 1977 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
DND, Padre Office Lahr, Germany, Defence Department |
1975 to 1975 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
DND, Judge Advocate General, DND |
1974 to 1974 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consultant
Public Health Agency, Communications Branch |
2005 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Consultant
Privy Council Office, External Advisory Committee |
2003 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Stakeholder Relations Officer
Commission on the Future of Health Care in Canada, Commissioner's Office |
2002 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Records Operations Supervisor
Fisheries and Oceans, Records Management Section |
1987 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Student Co-op Project
Transport Canada, Airport Authority Branch |
1987 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Student Co-op Project
Customs and Excise, Audit and Evaluation Branch |
1986 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Researcher
Parks Canada, Rideau Canal Historian Branch |
1984 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economist
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
1998 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Research Associate: Task Force on the Future of the Canadian Financial Services Sector
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
1997 to 1997 | Not a designated office |