The Canadian Life and Health Insurance Association Inc. (CLHIA) exists to serve its members in areas of common interest, need or concern. In carrying out this mission, the Association ensures that the views and interests of its diverse membership and of the public are equitably addressed. The CLHIA is guided by seven strategic objectives that drive all of its work, the three leading ones being: to build consensus among members on issues and concerns of importance to the industry; to promote a legislative and regulatory environment in Canada favourable to the business of its members; and to foster sound and equitable principles in the conduct of the business of its members.
Stephen Frank, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
79 Wellington Street West
Suite 2300, P.O. Box 99, TD South Tower
Toronto, ON M5K 1G8
Canada
Telephone number:
416-777-2221
Ext.
3092
Fax number:
416-777-1895
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Life and Health Insurance Association Inc./Association canadienne des compagnies d'assurances de personnes inc. | 2024-04-03 | current |
Canadian Life and Health Insurance Association Inc./Association canadienne des compagnies d'assurances de personnes inc. | 2009-08-28 | 2024-04-03 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Stephen Frank | 2017-07-01 | Current |
Frank Swedlove | 2007-07-30 | 2017-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economist
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
1998 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Research Associate: Task Force on the Future of the Canadian Financial Services Sector
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
1997 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Project Leader
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
2009 to 2011 | Not a designated office |
Senior Economist
Industry Canada, Mackenzie Gas Project Office |
2008 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Economist/Senior Economist
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
2003 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Tax Policy Officer
Department of Finance, Tax Policy Branch |
2001 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Financial Literacy
Financial Consumer Agency of Canada, Financial Literacy |
February 2007 to September 2008 | Not a designated office |
Director, Consumer Education and Public Affairs
Financial Consumer Agency of Canada, Financial Consumer Agency |
April 2002 to September 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consultant
Public Health Agency, Communications Branch |
2005 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Consultant
Privy Council Office, External Advisory Committee |
2003 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Stakeholder Relations Officer
Commission on the Future of Health Care in Canada, Commissioner's Office |
2002 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Records Operations Supervisor
Fisheries and Oceans, Records Management Section |
1987 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Student Co-op Project
Transport Canada, Airport Authority Branch |
1987 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Student Co-op Project
Customs and Excise, Audit and Evaluation Branch |
1986 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Researcher
Parks Canada, Rideau Canal Historian Branch |
1984 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to a Member of Parliament
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
1988 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economist
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
July 1990 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
July 1987 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Analyst
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
January 1987 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |