The Canadian Life and Health Insurance Association Inc. (CLHIA) exists to serve its members in areas of common interest, need or concern. In carrying out this mission, the Association ensures that the views and interests of its diverse membership and of the public are equitably addressed. The CLHIA is guided by seven strategic objectives that drive all of its work, the three leading ones being: to build consensus among members on issues and concerns of importance to the industry; to promote a legislative and regulatory environment in Canada favourable to the business of its members; and to foster sound and equitable principles in the conduct of the business of its members.
Frank Swedlove, President
Adresse :
1 Queen Street East
Suite 1700
Toronto, ON M5C 2X9
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
416-777-2221
Numéro de fax :
416-777-1221
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Canadian Life and Health Insurance Association Inc./Association canadienne des compagnies d'assurances de personnes inc. | 2024-04-03 | actuel |
Canadian Life and Health Insurance Association Inc./Association canadienne des compagnies d'assurances de personnes inc. | 2009-08-28 | 2024-04-03 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Stephen Frank | 2017-07-01 | Actuel |
Frank Swedlove | 2007-07-30 | 2017-07-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister
Financial Sector Policy Branch, Department of Finance |
2003 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
General Director
Financial Sector Policy Branch, Department of Finance |
2000 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Director
Financial Sector Review Group, Department of Finance |
1998 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director
Financial Sector Division, Department of Finance |
1993 à 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief
Financial Institutions Division, Department of Finance |
1985 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director for Canadianization
Mines and Resources, Department of Energy |
1981 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief
Foreign Investment Review Agency, Policy Branch |
1974 à 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Economist
Library of Parliament, Research Branch |
1974 à 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Combines Officer
Bureau of Competition, Department of Consumer and Corporate Affairs |
1973 à 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chair
House of Commons, Members' Orientation and Election Readiness Program |
2005 à 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Principal Clerk
House of Commons, Table Research Branch |
2005 à 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Principal Clerk
House of Commons, Information Management |
2004 à 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Principal Clerk
House of Commons, Table Research Branch |
2002 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Principal Clerk
House of Commons, PRISM Office |
2002 à 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Procedural Clerk
House of Commons, Legislative Counsel Office |
1993 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Procedural Clerk
House of Commons, Committee and Parliamentary Associations |
1993 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Clerk
House of Commons, Public Bills Office |
octobre 1991 à janvier 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Speaker of the House of Commons |
1990 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Deputy Clerk's Offices |
novembre 1988 à mars 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant
Elections Canada, Registrar of Political Parties |
octobre 1988 à octobre 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Committee Clerk
House of Commons, Committees Directorate |
1986 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Procedural Clerk
House of Commons, Table Research Branch |
1985 à janvier 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Statistical Analyst
House of Commons, Committees and Private Legislation Branch |
mars 1982 à juillet 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Indexer Analyst
House of Commons, Index and Reference Branch |
1982 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer Student
Solicitor General Canada, Solicitor General's Office |
1978 à 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer Student
Statistics Canada, Special Surveys, Ottawa |
1977 à 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer Student
DND, Padre Office Lahr, Germany, Defence Department |
1975 à 1975 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer Student
DND, Judge Advocate General, DND |
1974 à 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Consultant
Public Health Agency, Communications Branch |
2005 à 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Consultant
Privy Council Office, External Advisory Committee |
2003 à 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Stakeholder Relations Officer
Commission on the Future of Health Care in Canada, Commissioner's Office |
2002 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student Co-op Project
Transport Canada, Airport Authority Branch |
1987 à 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Records Operations Supervisor
Fisheries and Oceans, Records Management Section |
1987 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student Co-op Project
Customs and Excise, Audit and Evaluation Branch |
1986 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant Researcher
Parks Canada, Rideau Canal Historian Branch |
1984 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Economist
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
1998 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Research Associate: Task Force on the Future of the Canadian Financial Services Sector
Department of Finance, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
1997 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |