Founded in 1925, the Canadian Chamber of Commerce is the nation's largest business association, representing small and large firms from every sector and region in Canada. The Canadian Chamber is a network of 350 community chambers and boards of trade across Canada, in addition to individual corporate members and over 65 trade and professional organizations. The total membership exceeds 170,000. It is dedicated to the promotion and development of a strong economy. The chamber monitors federal and international issues, solicits the views of the Canadian business community and communicates them to policymakers in Ottawa and internationally. Headquartered in Ottawa, it also has staff in Toronto, Montreal and Calgary. www.chamber.ca
Perrin Beatty, President & CEO
Address:
360 Albert Street
Suite 420
Ottawa, ON K1R 7X7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-238-4000
Ext.
245
Fax number:
613-238-7643
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2024-05-08 | current |
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2008-07-14 | 2024-05-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Candace Laing | 2024-09-01 | Current |
Perrin Beatty | 2007-09-06 | 2024-09-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Non-Paying Internship
Foreign Affairsand International Trade Canada, Technical Barriers to Trade |
January 2006 to April 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
National Defence, Canadian Forces Staff School |
June 1986 to August 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Non-Paying Internship
Foreign Affairsand International Trade Canada, Technical Barriers to Trade |
January 2006 to April 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Strategic Communications Specialist
Office of the Commissioner of Official Languages, Strategic Communications |
April 2007 to June 2007 | Not a designated office |
Market Analyst
Public Works & Government Services, Information Technology Services Branch |
January 2005 to April 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Intern
Foreign Affairs & International Trade, Services Trade Policy Division |
July 2003 to March 2004 | Not a designated office |
Policy Intern
Foreign Affairs & International Trade, Services Trade Policy Division |
January 2002 to April 2002 | Not a designated office |
Investigator
Canadian Forces & National Defence, Ombudsman |
June 2001 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Student Employment Officer
Human Resoures, Toronto North Human Resource of Canada for Students |
May 2000 to June 2000 | Not a designated office |
Student Employment Officer
Human Resources, Toronto North Human Resource of Canada for Students |
May 1988 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chair
Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence, Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
Canada-European Union Economic Partnership Study Steering Committee, Canada-European Union Economic Partnership Study Steering Committee |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada, Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner, The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The CIDA Expert Panel on Partnership Programming, The CIDA Expert Panel on Partnership Programming |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee, The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee |
2005 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Advisory Council on national Security, The Advisory Council on national Security |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
President and Chief Executive Officer
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, Canadian Broadcasting Corporation |
1995 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Secretary of State for External Affairs
External Affairs, External Affairs |
1993 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Communications, Communications |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Health & Welfare, Health & Welfare |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Minister
National Defence, National Defence |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Solicitor General of Canada
Solicitor General, Solicitor General |
August 1985 to June 1986 | Not a designated office |
Minister of National Revenue and Minister responsible for Canada Post Corporation
National Revenue, National Revenue |
September 1984 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Minister of State
Treasury Board, Treasury Board |
June 1979 to February 1980 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
1972 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Office Manager
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
March 2000 to July 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
February 1999 to March 2000 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Industry Canada, Secretary of State, Science, Research and Development |
February 1997 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Private
Canadian Reserves, Canadian Armed Forces Reserves |
March 1972 to September 1973 | Not a designated office |