Founded in 1925, the Canadian Chamber of Commerce is the nation's largest business association, representing small and large firms from every sector and region in Canada. The Canadian Chamber is a network of 420 community chambers and boards of trade across Canada, in addition to individual corporate members and over 80 trade and professional organizations. The total membership exceeds 192,000. It is dedicated to the promotion and development of a strong economy. The chamber monitors federal and international issues, solicits the views of the Canadian business community and communicates them to policymakers in Ottawa and internationally. Headquartered in Ottawa, it also has staff in Toronto, Montreal and Calgary. www.chamber.ca
Perrin Beatty, President & Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2022-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Business Development Bank of Canada (BDC) | $58,000.00 | Yes |
Canada Employment Insurance Commission | $2,800.00 | No |
Canada Infrastructure Bank | $5,000.00 | No |
Canada Pension Plan Investment Board | $20,000.00 | No |
Canada Post Corporation (CPC) | $20,000.00 | No |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $44,275.00 | Yes |
Export Development Canada (EDC) | $70,000.00 | Yes |
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada (ISED) | $1,492,339.43 | Yes |
Montreal Port Authority | $50,000.00 | Yes |
Office of the Taxpayer’s Ombudsperson | $2,800.00 | Yes |
Vancouver Fraser Port Authority (Port Metro Vancouver) | $60,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
275 Slater Street
Floor 17
Ottawa, ON K1P 5H9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-238-4000
Ext.
2245
Fax number:
613-238-7643
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2024-05-08 | current |
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2008-07-14 | 2024-05-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Candace Laing | 2024-09-01 | Current |
Perrin Beatty | 2007-09-06 | 2024-09-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Human Resources Development Canada, Social Policy, Strategic Policy |
January 2001 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Associate Director of Communications
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
May 2017 to January 2020 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor, Strategic Communications and Manager, Digital Media
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
January 2016 to May 2017 | Not a designated office |
Content Manager
Prime Minister’s Office, Strategic Communications |
June 2015 to November 2015 | November 4, 2015 |
Summer intern
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
May 2005 to August 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Acting Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Office of MP Garnett Genuis |
September 2021 to October 2021 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of MP Garnett Genuis |
August 2020 to September 2021 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of MP Garnett Genuis |
November 2019 to August 2020 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Senate of Canada, Office of Senator Marilou McPhedran |
May 2018 to June 2018 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyst
Privy Council Office, Foreign and Defence Policy Secretariat |
September 2011 to May 2012 | Not a designated office |
Head of Political Affairs
Canadian Embassy to Brazil, Political Affairs Section |
September 2008 to September 2011 | Not a designated office |
Head of Political Affairs
Canadian Embassy to Venezuela, Political Affairs Section |
September 2003 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Head of Political Affairs
Canadian Embassy to Colombia, Political Affairs Section |
September 2000 to September 2003 | Not a designated office |
Second Secretary
Permanent Mission of Canada to the United Nations in New York, Political Affairs Section |
August 1998 to September 2000 | Not a designated office |
Legal Counsel, Law of the Sea
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Environmental and Oceans Law Division |
August 1997 to August 1998 | Not a designated office |
Desk Officer, OAS Affairs
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, South American Affairs Division |
July 1996 to August 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor (Contract)
Shared Services Canada, Corporate Services |
March 2015 to June 2015 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Corporate Services |
December 2014 to January 2017 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Shared Services Canada, Policy Advisor |
February 2013 to May 2014 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst (FSWEP)
Employment and Social Development Canada, Corporate Services |
June 2012 to September 2012 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Office of the Minister of State (Sport), Canadian Heritage |
June 2014 to November 2015 | November 15, 2015 |
Director of Policy
Office of the Minister of State (Sport), Canadian Heritage |
June 2011 to June 2014 | June 14, 2014 |
Policy Advisor
Office of the Minister of International Cooperation, Canadian International Development Agency |
October 2009 to June 2011 | June 19, 2011 |
Policy Advisor
Office of the Minister of State (Foreign Affairs)(Americas), Department of Foreign Affairs |
November 2008 to October 2009 | October 12, 2009 |
Policy Advisor
Office of the Minister of Transportation, Infrastructure and Communities, Department of Transportation |
June 2008 to November 2008 | November 4, 2008 |
Special Assistant (Policy)
Minister’s Office – Office of Secretary of State (Foreign Affairs and International Trade)(Sport), Dept. of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Dept. of Canadian Heritage |
January 2008 to June 2008 | Not a designated office |
Operations Assistant
Conservative Resource Group, House of Commons |
May 2007 to October 2007 | Not a designated office |
Student
Office of the Hon. David Emerson, Member of Parliament for Vancouver--Kingsway, House of Commons |
February 2006 to May 2007 | Not a designated office |
Student Intern
Office of David Tilson, Member of Parliament for Dufferin--Caledon, House of Commons |
June 2004 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief of Staff and Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Agriculture and Agrifood Canada, Office of the Minister |
June 2004 to August 2005 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Chief of Staff and Directory of Parliamentary Affairs
Indian Affairs and Northern Development, Office of the Minister |
December 2003 to June 2004 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Office of the Secretary of State (Rural Development) (FedNor), Office of the Secretary of State |
July 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister for International Trade |
December 1995 to January 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Treasury Board Secretariat, Office of the President |
December 1993 to December 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Affairs Advisor
House of Commons, Office of MP Ginette Petitpas Taylor |
September 2016 to March 2017 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of MP Anthony Housefather |
October 2015 to September 2016 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief Economist
Export Development Canada, Economics |
September 2017 to June 2021 | Not a designated office |
Senior Economist
Office of the Parliamentary Budget Officer, Economic and Fiscal Analysis |
August 2008 to January 2013 | Not a designated office |
Researcher
Finance Canada, Economic Studies and Policy Analysis Division |
June 2004 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Economist
Bank of Canada, Research Department |
October 2001 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chair
Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence, Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada, Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Advisory Council on national Security, The Advisory Council on national Security |
2005 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Member of Committee
The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner, The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee, The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee |
2005 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
President and Chief Executive Officer
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, Canadian Broadcasting Corporation |
1995 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Secretary of State for External Affairs
External Affairs, External Affairs |
1993 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Communications, Communications |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Health & Welfare, Health & Welfare |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Minister
National Defence, National Defence |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Solicitor General of Canada
Solicitor General, Solicitor General |
August 1985 to June 1986 | Not a designated office |
Minister of National Revenue and Minister responsible for Canada Post Corporation
National Revenue, National Revenue |
September 1984 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Minister of State
Treasury Board, Treasury Board |
June 1979 to February 1980 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
1972 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Human Resources Development Canada, Social Policy, Strategic Policy |
January 2001 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Analyst
Department of National Defence, Defence Research and Development Canada (DRDC) |
May 2021 to April 2022 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Parliament of Canada, House of Commons |
April 2004 to September 2004 | Not a designated office |