ACCC is the national and international voice of Canada's post-secondary colleges, institutes of technology, university-colleges,cégeps and polytechnics. A membership-based organization, ACCC acts as a forum and advocate for 131 institutions, representing their interests to government and industry.
Denise Amyot, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Citizenship and Immigration Canada | $5,224,797.00 | Yes |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $2,458,411.00 | Yes |
Foreign Affairs, Trade and Development Canada | $8,262,905.00 | Yes |
Public Works and Government Services Canada | $285,212.00 | Yes |
Address:
1 Rideau Street
Suite 701
Ottawa, ON K1N 8S7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-746-2222
Ext.
6492
Fax number:
613-746-6721
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Colleges and Institutes Canada/Collèges et instituts Canada | 2024-05-01 | current |
Colleges and Institutes Canada/Collèges et instituts Canada | 2014-05-27 | 2024-05-01 |
Association of Canadian Community Colleges/Association des collèges communautaires du Canada | 2008-08-29 | 2014-05-27 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Pari Johnston | 2023-12-04 | Current |
Denise Amyot | 2013-06-04 | 2023-12-04 |
James Knight | 2008-01-17 | 2013-06-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
President and CEO
Crown Corporation, Canada Science and Technology Museums Corporation |
January 2009 to May 2013 | Not a designated office |
Senior Vice-President
Canadian Public Service Agency, Leadership and Talent Management |
January 2007 to January 2009 | January 4, 2009 |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources & Social Development Canada, Public Affairs and Ministerial Services |
March 2006 to December 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources & Social Development Canada, Corporate Management and Public Affairs |
March 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Natural Resources Canada, Communications |
November 2000 to February 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Public Service Commission, Recruitment Programs |
August 2000 to November 2001 | Not a designated office |
Associate Director General
Human Resources Development Canada, Labour Market |
January 1998 to July 2000 | Not a designated office |
Regional Director
Indian & Northern Affairs, Funding Services-Quebec Region |
November 1995 to December 1997 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Policy, Film and Video
Canadian Heritage, Cultural Industries Branch |
April 1995 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Operations/Manager of Policy
Canadian Heritage, Race Relations |
August 1994 to March 1995 | Not a designated office |
A/Director-Policy and Strategies
Solicitor General, National Parole Board |
January 1994 to July 1994 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Operations/Manager of Policy
Canadian Heritage, Race Relations |
March 1990 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director
Department of National Defence, Dependant Education |
April 1987 to March 1990 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst and Program Officer
Official Languages, Secretary of State |
December 1984 to April 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
President and CEO
Crown Corporation, Canada Science and Technology Museums Corporation |
January 2009 to May 2013 | Not a designated office |
Senior Vice-President
Canadian Public Service Agency, Leadership and Talent Management |
January 2007 to January 2009 | January 4, 2009 |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources & Social Development Canada, Public Affairs and Ministerial Services |
March 2006 to December 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources & Social Development Canada, Corporate Management and Public Affairs |
March 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Natural Resources Canada, Communications |
November 2000 to February 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Public Service Commission, Recruitment Programs |
August 2000 to November 2001 | Not a designated office |
Associate Director General
Human Resources Development Canada, Labour Market |
January 1998 to July 2000 | Not a designated office |
Regional Director
Indian & Northern Affairs, Funding Services-Quebec Region |
November 1995 to December 1997 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Policy, Film and Video
Canadian Heritage, Cultural Industries Branch |
April 1995 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Operations/Manager of Policy
Canadian Heritage, Race Relations |
August 1994 to March 1995 | Not a designated office |
A/Director-Policy and Strategies
Solicitor General, National Parole Board |
January 1994 to July 1994 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Operations/Manager of Policy
Canadian Heritage, Race Relations |
March 1990 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director
Department of National Defence, Dependant Education |
April 1987 to March 1990 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst and Program Officer
Official Languages, Secretary of State |
December 1984 to April 1987 | Not a designated office |