Colleges and Institutes Canada (CICan) is the national and international voice of Canada's post-secondary colleges, institutes of technology, university-colleges,cégeps and polytechnics. A membership-based organization, CICan acts as a forum and advocate for 131 institutions, representing their interests to government and industry.
Denise Amyot, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2016-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $377,501.00 | Yes |
Environment and Climate Change Canada (ECCC) | $693,006.00 | Yes |
Global Affairs Canada (GAC) | $13,104,038.00 | Yes |
Immigration, Refugees and Citizenship Canada (IRCC) | $4,298,630.00 | Yes |
Public Services and Procurement Canada (PSPC) | $228,170.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $21,740.00 | No |
Address:
1 Rideau Street
Suite 701
Ottawa, ON K1N 8S7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-746-2222
Ext.
6492
Fax number:
613-746-6721
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Colleges and Institutes Canada/Collèges et instituts Canada | 2024-05-01 | current |
Colleges and Institutes Canada/Collèges et instituts Canada | 2014-05-27 | 2024-05-01 |
Association of Canadian Community Colleges/Association des collèges communautaires du Canada | 2008-08-29 | 2014-05-27 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Pari Johnston | 2023-12-04 | Current |
Denise Amyot | 2013-06-04 | 2023-12-04 |
James Knight | 2008-01-17 | 2013-06-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
President and CEO
Crown Corporation, Canada Science and Technology Museums Corporation |
January 2009 to May 2013 | Not a designated office |
Senior Vice-President
Canadian Public Service Agency, Leadership and Talent Management |
January 2007 to January 2009 | January 4, 2009 |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources & Social Development Canada, Public Affairs and Ministerial Services |
March 2006 to December 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources & Social Development Canada, Corporate Management and Public Affairs |
March 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Natural Resources Canada, Communications |
November 2000 to February 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Public Service Commission, Recruitment Programs |
August 2000 to November 2001 | Not a designated office |
Associate Director General
Human Resources Development Canada, Labour Market |
January 1998 to July 2000 | Not a designated office |
Regional Director
Indian & Northern Affairs, Funding Services-Quebec Region |
November 1995 to December 1997 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Policy, Film and Video
Canadian Heritage, Cultural Industries Branch |
April 1995 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Operations/Manager of Policy
Canadian Heritage, Race Relations |
August 1994 to March 1995 | Not a designated office |
A/Director-Policy and Strategies
Solicitor General, National Parole Board |
January 1994 to July 1994 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Operations/Manager of Policy
Canadian Heritage, Race Relations |
March 1990 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director
Department of National Defence, Dependant Education |
April 1987 to March 1990 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst and Program Officer
Official Languages, Secretary of State |
December 1984 to April 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Director
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council, Corporate Strategy and Performance |
June 2010 to May 2015 | Not a designated office |
Director
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council, Policy, Planning, Gorvenance and International |
July 2009 to June 2012 | Not a designated office |
Corporate Secretary
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council, Corporate Secretariat |
July 2006 to July 2009 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Principal Clerk
House of Commons, Journal Branch |
January 2005 to June 2006 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Principal Clerk
House of Commons, Table Research Branch |
January 2002 to December 2004 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Principal Clerk
House of Commons, PRISM Program |
January 1999 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Head
House of Commons, Corporate Communications |
January 1998 to December 1998 | Not a designated office |
Head
House of Commons, Corporate Review |
July 1997 to December 1997 | Not a designated office |
Manager
House of Commons, Electronic Publishing |
January 1996 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Committee Clerk
House of Commons, Committees Directorate |
September 1994 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Clerk of the House of Commons |
September 1992 to August 1994 | Not a designated office |
Procedural Clerk
House of Commons, Table Research Branch |
September 1987 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Indexer-Analyst
House of Commons, Index and Reference Branch |
April 1985 to August 1987 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament |
September 1982 to March 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Procedural Clerk
House of Commons, Procedural Services |
November 2000 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Data Quality Analyst
NSERC, Information Technology Division |
May 1995 to May 1997 | Not a designated office |
National Liaison Officer
National Library of Canada, National and International Programs |
January 1994 to April 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Advisor
Global Affairs Canada, International Education |
January 2016 to March 2016 | Not a designated office |
First Secretary and Trade Commissioner
Gobal Affairs Canada, High Commission of Canada, New Delhi, India |
August 2011 to December 2015 | Not a designated office |
First Secretary and Trade Commissioner
Global Affairs Canada, Embassy of Canada, Beijing, China |
August 2008 to July 2011 | Not a designated office |
Second Secretary
Global Affairs Canada, Immigration, High Commission of Canada, Delhi, India |
August 2002 to July 2006 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to Director General
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, International Region |
August 2000 to July 2002 | Not a designated office |
Third Secretary
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Consulate General of Canada, Hong Kong |
September 1997 to July 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade (DFAIT), International Crime and Terrorism |
April 2013 to December 2013 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade (DFAIT), International Crime and Terrorism |
July 2011 to September 2011 | Not a designated office |
Policy Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade (DFAIT), International Crime and Terrorism |
September 2010 to April 2011 | Not a designated office |
Policy Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade (DFAIT), Aboriginal and Circumpolar Affairs |
January 2008 to May 2008 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade (DFAIT), Peacebuilding |
May 2007 to September 2007 | Not a designated office |
Program Coordinator
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade (DFAIT), Landmines |
January 2006 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
President and CEO
Crown Corporation, Canada Science and Technology Museums Corporation |
January 2009 to May 2013 | Not a designated office |
Senior Vice-President
Canadian Public Service Agency, Leadership and Talent Management |
January 2007 to January 2009 | January 4, 2009 |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources & Social Development Canada, Public Affairs and Ministerial Services |
March 2006 to December 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources & Social Development Canada, Corporate Management and Public Affairs |
March 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Natural Resources Canada, Communications |
November 2000 to February 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Public Service Commission, Recruitment Programs |
August 2000 to November 2001 | Not a designated office |
Associate Director General
Human Resources Development Canada, Labour Market |
January 1998 to July 2000 | Not a designated office |
Regional Director
Indian & Northern Affairs, Funding Services-Quebec Region |
November 1995 to December 1997 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Policy, Film and Video
Canadian Heritage, Cultural Industries Branch |
April 1995 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Operations/Manager of Policy
Canadian Heritage, Race Relations |
August 1994 to March 1995 | Not a designated office |
A/Director-Policy and Strategies
Solicitor General, National Parole Board |
January 1994 to July 1994 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Operations/Manager of Policy
Canadian Heritage, Race Relations |
March 1990 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director
Department of National Defence, Dependant Education |
April 1987 to March 1990 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst and Program Officer
Official Languages, Secretary of State |
December 1984 to April 1987 | Not a designated office |