Established in 1964, Insurance Bureau of Canada (IBC) is the voice of companies that insure the homes, cars and businesses of Canadians. IBC member companies provide close to 90 percent of the non-government general insurance sold in Canada. Government auto insurers also participate with private insurers in IBC vehicle information programs. As the trade association for the general insurance industry, the role of IBC is to be active in the business environment on behalf of its members, forecasting and responding to issues that may arise, and anticipating opportunities to identify, shape and influence change in support of members business needs. IBC lobbies the federal and provincial governments to secure changes in public policy and improvements in the business-operating environment that will benefit insurance companies and their customers. It works on a number of fronts to increase public understanding of home, car and business insurance. Public understanding is also fostered in four IBC regional consumer centres, where trained personnel with many years of industry and government relations experience answer tens of thousands of consumer inquiries each year.
Celyeste Power, President & Chief Executive Officer
Adresse :
777 Bay Street Suite 1900
P.O. Box 121
TORONTO, ON M5G 2C8
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
416-362-2031
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
INSURANCE BUREAU OF CANADA/BUREAU D'ASSURANCE DU CANADA | 2024-04-08 | actuel |
INSURANCE BUREAU OF CANADA/BUREAU D'ASSURANCE DU CANADA | 2008-08-07 | 2024-04-08 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Celyeste Power | 2023-01-01 | Actuel |
Don Forgeron | 2009-04-22 | 2023-01-01 |
Mark Yakabuski | 2008-01-23 | 2009-04-22 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Issues Manager
Office of the Prime Minister, Office of the Prime Minister |
août 2011 à mars 2013 | mars 22, 2013 |
Director of Communications
Office of the Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs, Office of the President of the Queen's Privy Council |
avril 2011 à août 2011 | août 30, 2011 |
Press Secretary
Office of the Minister of Citizenship, Immigration & Multiculturalism, Office of the Minister |
janvier 2010 à avril 2011 | avril 22, 2011 |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant, Communications
National Defence, Office of the Minister of National Defence |
décembre 2007 à septembre 2008 | septembre 12, 2008 |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Public Affairs Officer
Department of National Defence, Canadian Armed Forces |
août 1992 à mars 2013 | Pas une charge désignée |
Public Affairs Officer
Department of National Defence, Canadian Armed Forces |
juin 1981 à octobre 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |