Engineers Canada is the national organization of the provincial and territorial associations that regulate the practice of engineering in Canada and license Canada's 300,000 professional engineers. Established in 1936, Engineers Canada delivers national programs that ensure the highest standard of engineering education, professional qualifications and ethical conduct. Engineers Canada is the voice of the associations and ordre at the national and international level and promotes a greater understanding of the role and contribution of engineering to society. Through the Canadian Engineering Accreditation Board (CEAB), Engineers Canada accredits undergraduate and graduate engineering programs in Canada that meet or exceed educational standards required to be granted registration as a professional engineer in Canada. The Canadian Engineering Qualifications Board (CEQB), formulates national guidelines on the qualifications and standards of practice required of professional engineers. Engineers Canada is the business name of the Canadian Council of Professional Engineers.
Gerard McDonald, Chief Executive Officer
Adresse :
55 Metcalfe Street
Suite 300
Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-232-2474
Poste
212
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Engineers Canada/Ingénieurs Canada | 2024-04-19 | actuel |
Engineers Canada/Ingénieurs Canada | 2008-08-07 | 2024-04-19 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Philip Rizcallah | 2024-08-06 | Actuel |
Gerard McDonald | 2018-02-12 | 2024-08-06 |
Stephanie Price | 2017-02-17 | 2018-02-12 |
Kim Allen | 2012-09-11 | 2017-02-17 |
Marie Carter | 2012-02-24 | 2012-09-11 |
Chantal Guay | 2008-04-04 | 2012-02-24 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister
Transport Canada, Safety and Security |
juillet 2010 à février 2014 | février 20, 2014 |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister
Transport Canada, Safety and Security |
juillet 2010 à février 2014 | février 20, 2014 |