Engineers Canada is the national organization of the provincial and territorial associations and ordre that regulate the practicve of engineering in Canada and license Canada's 160,000 professional engineers. Established in 1936, Engineers Canada delivers national programs that ensure the highest standard of engineering education, professional qualifications and ethical conduct. Engineers Canada is the voice of the associations and ordre at the national and international level and promotes a greater understanding of the role and contribution of engineering to society. Through the Canadian Engineering Accreditation Board (CEAB), Engineers Canada accredits undergradute and graduate engineering programs in Canada that meet or exceed educational standartds required to be granted registration as a professional engineer in Canada. The Canadian Engineering Qualifications Board (CEQB), formulates national guidelines on the qualifications and standards of practice required of professional engineers. Engineers Canada is the business name of the Canadian Council of Professional Engineers.
Chantal Guay, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2008-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (DFAITC) | $18,535.00 | No |
Human Resources and Social Development Canada (HRSDC) | $1,207,103.00 | Yes |
Infrastructure Canada | $0.00 | Yes |
Infrastructure Canada (INFC) | $253,866.91 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $277,902.80 | Yes |
Address:
180 Elgin Street
Suite 1100
Ottawa, ON K2P 2K3
Canada
Telephone number:
613-232-2474
Ext.
269
Fax number:
613-230-5759
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Engineers Canada/Ingénieurs Canada | 2024-04-19 | current |
Engineers Canada/Ingénieurs Canada | 2008-08-07 | 2024-04-19 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Philip Rizcallah | 2024-08-06 | Current |
Gerard McDonald | 2018-02-12 | 2024-08-06 |
Stephanie Price | 2017-02-17 | 2018-02-12 |
Kim Allen | 2012-09-11 | 2017-02-17 |
Marie Carter | 2012-02-24 | 2012-09-11 |
Chantal Guay | 2008-04-04 | 2012-02-24 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Minister (GTA
Department of Transport, Minister's Office |
1998 to March 2000 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Justice
House of Commons, member's OFfice |
1995 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Justice
House of Commons, Member's Office |
1994 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Scheduling Assistant to the Minsiter of International Trade
Interantioanl Trade, Minister's Office |
November 1993 to June 1994 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to Hon. Jim Peterson
House of Commons, Member's office |
August 1990 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant to Hon. Warren Allmand, M.P.
House of Commons, Member's Office |
1990 to August 1990 | Not a designated office |
Receptionist CR-03
External Affairs, Minister's Office |
1987 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Minister (GTA
Department of Transport, Minister's Office |
1998 to March 2000 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Justice
House of Commons, member's OFfice |
1995 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Justice
House of Commons, Member's Office |
1994 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Scheduling Assistant to the Minsiter of International Trade
Interantioanl Trade, Minister's Office |
November 1993 to June 1994 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to Hon. Jim Peterson
House of Commons, Member's office |
August 1990 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant to Hon. Warren Allmand, M.P.
House of Commons, Member's Office |
1990 to August 1990 | Not a designated office |
Receptionist CR-03
External Affairs, Minister's Office |
1987 to 1990 | Not a designated office |