Imperial Oil is one of Canada’s largest corporations and a leading member of the country’s petroleum industry. The company is a major producer of crude oil and natural gas, Canada’s largest petroleum refiner, a key petrochemical producer and a leading marketer with coast-to-coast supply and retail service station networks.
Richard Kruger, Chairman, president and CEO
Address:
237 4th Avenue S.W.
Calgary, AB T2P 3M9
Canada
Telephone number:
800-567-3776
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Imperial Oil Limited | 2024-04-01 | current |
Imperial Oil Limited | 2008-07-15 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Brad Corson | 2020-01-01 | Current |
Richard Kruger | 2013-04-01 | 2020-01-01 |
Bruce March | 2008-04-09 | 2013-04-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications and Issues Management
Government House Leader, Minister's Office |
August 2010 to December 2010 | December 31, 2010 |
Director of Issues Management and Parliamentary Affairs
Transport Canada, Minister's Office |
October 2009 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Director Issues Management
Prime Minister's Office, Prime Minister's Office |
April 2008 to October 2009 | October 1, 2009 |
Senior Special Assistant Parliamentary Affairs
Environment Canada, Minister's Office |
January 2007 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Secretary Assistant
Treasury Board Secretariat, Minister's Office |
February 2006 to January 2007 | Not a designated office |