Total Number of Communication Reports: 91
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Grain handling and marketing, agri-products sales, fertilizer manufacturing and sales, food processing
MAYO SCHMIDT, PRESIDENT & CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
Address:
2625 Victoria Avenue
Regina, SK S4T 7T9
Canada
Telephone number:
306-569-4202
Fax number:
306-569-5133
Viterra Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Viterra Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Viterra Inc. | 2008-10-21 | 2019-09-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Kyle Jeworski | 2013-01-07 | 2019-09-04 |
MAYO SCHMIDT | 2008-03-31 | 2013-01-07 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
February 2004 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
National Youth and Internship Coordinator
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
October 2002 to February 2004 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
Constituency Office of Rob Anders, MP, Constituency Office of Rob Anders, MP |
October 2002 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Coordinator
Parliament of Canada, Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
January 2001 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Summer Intern
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
August 2000 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |
Summer Intern
Parliament of Canada, Constituency Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
May 1999 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Summer Intern
Parliament of Canada, Constituency Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
May 1998 to August 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
February 2004 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
National Youth and Internship Coordinator
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
October 2002 to February 2004 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
Constituency Office of Rob Anders, MP, Constituency Office of Rob Anders, MP |
October 2002 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Coordinator
Parliament of Canada, Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
January 2001 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Summer Intern
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
August 2000 to August 2000 | Not a designated office |
Summer Intern
Parliament of Canada, Constituency Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
May 1999 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Summer Intern
Parliament of Canada, Constituency Office of Gerry Ritz, MP |
May 1998 to August 1998 | Not a designated office |