Pulse Canada is a confederation of industry and grower organizations with an interest in production and marketing of pea, lentil, bean and chickpea crops in Canada. Pulse Canada focuses on increasing demand for pulse crops, promotion of Canadian pulse crops, and on removal of barriers to trade or movement of pulse crops to markets around the world.
Greg Cherewyk, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $2,470,391.35 | Yes |
Manitoba Department of Agriculture | $58,271.25 | Yes |
National Research Council (NRC) | $50,375.00 | Yes |
Protein Industries Canada | $859,984.27 | Yes |
Address:
920-220 Portage Avenue
Winnipeg, MB R3C 0A5
Canada
Telephone number:
204-925-4457
Fax number:
204-925-4454
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Pulse Canada | 2024-04-14 | current |
Pulse Canada | 2008-07-01 | 2024-04-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Greg Cherewyk | 2021-01-29 | Current |
Gordon Bacon | 2008-03-25 | 2021-01-29 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Office of The Minister of Agriculture & Agri-Food, House of Commons |
January 2014 to November 2015 | November 30, 2015 |
Press Secretary
Office of The Minister of Agriculture & Agri-Food, House of Commons |
May 2011 to January 2014 | January 31, 2014 |
Member's Assistant
Office of LeVar Payne, MP, House of Commons |
January 2011 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Office of the Minister of Agriculture, House of Commons |
May 2009 to August 2009 | August 31, 2009 |