The Canadian Electricity Association (CEA) is the national voice for safe, secure and sustainable electricity for all Canadians, promoting it as a key social, economic and environmental enabler that is essential to Canada's prosperity. CEA members generate, transmit and distribute electrical energy to industrial, commercial, residential and institutional customers across Canada. Members include integrated electric utilities, independent power producers, transmission and distribution companies, power marketers and the manufacturers and suppliers of materials, technology and services that keep the industry running smoothly.
Sergio Marchi, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
275 Slater Street
Suite 1500
Ottawa, ON K1P 5H9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-230-9263
Ext.
213
Fax number:
613-230-9326
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
ELECTRICITY CANADA/ÉLECTRICITÉ CANADA | 2024-04-30 | current |
ELECTRICITY CANADA/ÉLECTRICITÉ CANADA | 2022-03-01 | 2024-04-30 |
CANADIAN ELECTRICITY ASSOCIATION/ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DE L'ELECTRICITE | 2008-08-12 | 2022-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Francis Bradley | 2018-12-14 | Current |
Sergio Marchi | 2015-02-09 | 2018-12-14 |
Jim Burpee | 2012-02-02 | 2015-02-09 |
Pierre Guimond | 2008-05-30 | 2012-02-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Advisor
Hose of Commons, MP Stephen Woodworth’s Office |
May 2013 to October 2015 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Minister of the Environment’s Office, Minister of the Environment’s Office |
April 2009 to September 2009 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Prime Minister’s Office, Prime Minister’s Office |
September 2008 to December 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Unpaid Research Internship
Canada School of Public Service, Director of Research |
April 2012 to September 2012 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Department of Industry Canada, Environmental Affairs Branch |
August 1999 to June 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Science Specialist
Environment Canada, River Road Labs |
2013 to 2014 | Not a designated office |
Senior Project Officer
Environment Canada, Science and Technology Branch |
2010 to 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
January 2016 to January 2017 | Not a designated office |
Manager of Parliamentary Affairs
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
July 2011 to October 2015 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
April 2010 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Issues Manager and Stakeholder Relations
Status of Women Canada, Department of Status of Women Canada |
January 2010 to April 2010 | April 1, 2010 |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
February 2007 Footnote 3 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Commissioner on the United Nations Global Commission on International Migration
Department of Foreign Affairs, Trade and Development, International Trade |
June 2003 to June 2005 | Not a designated office |
Ambassador, World Trade Organization
Department of Foreign Affairs, Trade and Development, International Trade |
September 1999 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Minister
International Trade, Minister's Office |
June 1997 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Environment Canada, Minister's Office |
October 1995 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Minister's Office |
October 1993 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
Parliament of Canada, House of Commons |
September 1984 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Program Manager
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Energy Efficiency |
January 2010 to September 2013 | Not a designated office |
Strategic Planning Advisor
Transport Canada, Communications and Marketing |
May 2009 to September 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Transport Canada, Innovation Directorate |
April 2008 to April 2009 | Not a designated office |
Technology Officer, Investments
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Energy Research and Development |
May 2007 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Program Officer
Transport Canada, Security Task Force |
October 2006 to May 2007 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer
Environment Canada, International Affairs Branch |
November 2005 to April 2006 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer
Environment Canada, Environmental Technology Advancement Directorate |
October 2001 to January 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Advisor
Hose of Commons, MP Stephen Woodworth’s Office |
May 2013 to October 2015 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Minister of the Environment’s Office, Minister of the Environment’s Office |
April 2009 to September 2009 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Prime Minister’s Office, Prime Minister’s Office |
September 2008 to December 2008 | Not a designated office |