Founded in 1891, Electricity Canada (formerly the Canadian Electricity Association) is the national forum and voice of the evolving and innovative electricity business in Canada. The Association supports, through its advocacy efforts, the regional, national, and international success of its members. Electricity Canada members generate, transmit, and distribute electrical energy to industrial, commercial, residential, and institutional customers across Canada. Members include integrated electric utilities, independent power producers, transmission and distribution companies, power marketers, manufacturers and suppliers of materials, technology, and services and represent over 85% of the Canadian population. Electricity Canada is the national voice for sustainable electricity for its members and the customers they serve as the country works towards a Net Zero by 2050 future.
Francis Bradley, President and CEO
Address:
275 Slater Street
Suite 1500
Ottawa, ON K1P 5H9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-230-9263
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
ELECTRICITY CANADA/ÉLECTRICITÉ CANADA | 2024-04-30 | current |
ELECTRICITY CANADA/ÉLECTRICITÉ CANADA | 2022-03-01 | 2024-04-30 |
CANADIAN ELECTRICITY ASSOCIATION/ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DE L'ELECTRICITE | 2008-08-12 | 2022-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Francis Bradley | 2018-12-14 | Current |
Sergio Marchi | 2015-02-09 | 2018-12-14 |
Jim Burpee | 2012-02-02 | 2015-02-09 |
Pierre Guimond | 2008-05-30 | 2012-02-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Program Manager
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Energy Efficiency |
January 2010 to September 2013 | Not a designated office |
Strategic Planning Advisor
Transport Canada, Communications and Marketing |
May 2009 to September 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Transport Canada, Innovation Directorate |
April 2008 to April 2009 | Not a designated office |
Technology Officer, Investments
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Energy Research and Development |
May 2007 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Program Officer
Transport Canada, Security Task Force |
October 2006 to May 2007 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer
Environment Canada, International Affairs Branch |
November 2005 to April 2006 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer
Environment Canada, Environmental Technology Advancement Directorate |
October 2001 to January 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant / Senior Special Assistant
Ministry of the Environment, Office of the Minister |
August 2014 to December 2015 | December 4, 2015 |
Project Assistant
Industry Canada, Corporations Canada |
May 2010 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Constituency Office of Hon. Patricia (Paddy) Torsney, MP |
November 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Constituency Office of Hon. Patricia (Paddy) Torsney, MP |
May 2005 to June 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Science Specialist
Environment Canada, River Road Labs |
2013 to 2014 | Not a designated office |
Senior Project Officer
Environment Canada, Science and Technology Branch |
2010 to 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Junior Analyst
Canadian Coast Guard, Arctic Strategies and Engagement |
May 2019 to August 2019 | Not a designated office |
Operations Officer
Global Affairs Canada, Emergency Watch and Response Center |
September 2018 to December 2019 | Not a designated office |
Negotiation Intern
Indigenous and Northern Affairs Canada, Specific Claims Branch |
January 2018 to April 2018 | Not a designated office |
Co-op/FSWEP Student
Statistics Canada, Health Division |
May 2017 to December 2017 | Not a designated office |
Enumerator
Statistics Canada, Census Program |
2016 to 2016 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Department of Industry Canada, Environmental Affairs Branch |
August 1999 to June 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Advisor
Hose of Commons, MP Stephen Woodworth’s Office |
May 2013 to October 2015 | Not a designated office |
Communications Officer
Environment Canada, Communications, National Capital Region |
October 2009 to October 2010 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Minister of the Environment’s Office, Minister of the Environment’s Office |
April 2009 to September 2009 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Prime Minister’s Office, Prime Minister’s Office |
September 2008 to December 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Unpaid Research Internship
Canada School of Public Service, Director of Research |
April 2012 to September 2012 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Corporal (Reservist)
Canadian Armed Forces, Governor Generals Footguards |
1990 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Team Leader
Immigration, Refugees and Citizenship Canada, Operational Support Centre (OSC) |
March 2017 to August 2017 | Not a designated office |
Program Officer / Subject Matter Expert
Immigration, Refugees and Citizenship Canada, Operational Support Centre (OSC) |
September 2013 to March 2016 | Not a designated office |
Clerical Assistant to Member of Parliament
House of Commons, Office of Member of Parliament |
September 2012 to June 2013 | Not a designated office |